Story v. Ellis County Court 40th District et al
Plaintiff: Zachery Story
Defendant: Lindy Beaty, Ellis County Court 40th District and Ellis County Jail
Case Number: 3:2019cv01994
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Status Request by Zachery Story with Deputy Clerk Response. (mla)
September 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: Order #6 re-mailed to plaintiff to updated address on 9/11/2019. (aaa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Zachery Story. (aaa)
August 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Aug 30 13:57:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/30/2019) (mla)
August 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Aug 23 16:27:01 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER in amount of $10.79 with a balance of $339.21 remaining due in monthly installments. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/23/2019) (epm)
August 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Aug 21 11:14:17 CDT 2019
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Zachery Story. (sre)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Lindy Beaty, Ellis County Court 40th District, Ellis County Jail filed by Zachery Story. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Story v. Ellis County Court 40th District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindy Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis County Court 40th District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachery Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?