Cledera v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Robert Paul M Cledera and Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera
Defendant: United States, RING (Amazon Inc), Charles Edge, Steve Dye, William Barr, ARLO (Netgear Inc), Tracy Aaron, James McHenry, Steven C. McCraw, Gregory Fellows, Dominique Artis, AG EOIR, LG Corp, Walmart Inc, Robert Fite, Verizon Communications, Gary C Thomas, Kevin K McAleenan, Target Corporation, Brian Manley, U Renee Hall, Best Buy Co Inc, The Walt Disney Company, Home Depot Product Authority LLC, Apple Inc, Ryan Holt, Will Johnson, HomePro Operating LLC, ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc), City of Mansfield, Verizon Communications Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc, City of Grand Prairie, Steven C McCraw, RING (Amazon.com Inc) and Menifee Police Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv01997
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 117 RESPONSE filed by William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, United States re: #112 MOTION for Permissive Joinder (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
January 27, 2020 Filing 116 REPLY filed by Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Reeder, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 115 REPLY filed by William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, United States re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss (on behalf of federal defendants) (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
January 21, 2020 Filing 114 REPLY filed by Walmart Inc re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Davis, Derek)
January 16, 2020 Filing 113 REPLY Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by The Walt Disney Company re #82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Boeck, Christopher) Modified title on 1/17/2020 (awc).
January 15, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION for Permissive Joinder filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera. (axm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 111 RESPONSE to Menifee Police Department Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (axm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 110 RESPONSE filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss (on behalf of federal defendants). (axm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 109 RESPONSE to Walt Disney Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (axm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 108 RESPONSE to Walmart Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). (axm)
December 23, 2019 Filing 107 REPLY filed by Will Johnson re: #61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fugate, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 106 REPLY filed by Brian Manley re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Birring, Sameer)
December 16, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE to Arlington Police Department Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (axm)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Responses to #101 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim due by 1/13/2020. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/13/2019) (svc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department. (Scott, Nicholas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 102 REPLY filed by Verizon Communications Inc re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Keener, Tab)
December 12, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department (Reeder, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Verizon Communications Inc. (Keener, Tab)
December 12, 2019 Filing 99 REPLY filed by Charles Edge re: #50 Motion to Dismiss, Answer to Complaint (Montgomery, D)
December 6, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Austin Police Department Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss. (axm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 97 REPLY filed by Home Depot Product Authority LLC re: #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ewert, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Filing 96 REPLY filed by HomePro Operating LLC re: #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Coles, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Filing 95 REPLY filed by Tracy Aaron, City of Mansfield re: #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous (Jeffrey, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 94 REPLY filed by City of Grand Prairie, Steve Dye, Robert Fite re: #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous (Jeffrey, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 93 REPLY filed by Dominique Artis, U Renee Hall re: #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Wilson, Tatia)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Cledera must file a written response to the motion by 1/3/2020. Wal-Mart may file a reply brief, but no additional documents 1/21/2020. re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/4/2019) (svc)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Cledera must file written responses to the motions by 1/3/2020. The moving defendants may file reply briefs, but no additional documents, by 1/21/2020. re: #77 MOTION to Dismiss (on behalf of federal defendants), #82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by The Walt Disney Company's (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/4/2019) (svc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Walt Disney Company. (Boeck, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel filed by Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department (Reeder, David)
December 2, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #50 Motion to Dismiss. (axm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 87 REPLY filed by Best Buy Co Inc, Target Corporation re: #16 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) (Peavler, Donna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 86 REPLY filed by ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc) re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Howton, Skyler)
December 2, 2019 Filing 84 REPLY filed by LG Electronics USA Inc re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and (12)(b)(6) (Taylor, Jana)
November 27, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Cellco Partnership, dba: Verizon Communications Inc Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss. (axm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 83 Appendix in Support filed by The Walt Disney Company re #82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Boeck, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The Walt Disney Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher Boeck added to party The Walt Disney Company(pty:dft) (Boeck, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE to Texas Department of Public Safety Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #41 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) & (6). (axm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE to Dallas Area Rapid Transit Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (axm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Home Depot Product Authority LLC Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (axm)
November 24, 2019 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, United States. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
November 24, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss (on behalf of federal defendants) filed by William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, United States with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ added to party Kevin K McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ added to party James McHenry(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ added to party United States(pty:dft) (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian)
November 22, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY filed by Ryan Holt re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(c), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(5) (Barrett, Roy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Dallas Police & Fire Department Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 20, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE to Grand Prairie Police & Fire Department Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 20, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Mansfield Police Department Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 20, 2019 Filing 72 RESPONSE to HomePro Operating LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 20, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE to Arlo Technologies Inc Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 20, 2019 Filing 70 REPLY to LG Electronics USA Inc Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and (12)(b)(6). (axm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 69 REPLY filed by Apple Inc re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support (Cochran, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Apple Inc's Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support. (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 15, 2019 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Target and Best Buy Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #16 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6). (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 15, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Waco Police Department Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(c), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(5). (axm) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ctf).
November 15, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Submit Proof of Service filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera. (axm)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Responses due by 12/16/2019. Replies due by 12/31/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/15/2019) (rekc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Will Johnson. (Fugate, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 62 Appendix in Support filed by Will Johnson re #61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fugate, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Will Johnson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Robert H Fugate added to party Will Johnson(pty:dft) (Fugate, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Menifee Police Department answer due 12/16/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/14/2019) (mla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 59 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gregory Fellows, Menifee Police Department, Gregory Fellows (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Nicholas Joseph Scott added to party Gregory Fellows(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Joseph Scott added to party Menifee Police Department(pty:dft) (Scott, Nicholas)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant Brian Manley, the Chief of Police in Austin, Texas, now moves to dismiss the claims asserted against him in that complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). See Dkt. No. #56 . Cledera must file a written response to the motion by 12/6/2019. Manley may file a reply brief, but no additional documents, by 12/23/2019. Please note that deadlines in this order are for filing or delivery and are not mailing dates. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/6/2019) (ndt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brian Manley. (Birring, Sameer)
November 5, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Brian Manley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sameer Singh Birring added to party Brian Manley(pty:dft) (Birring, Sameer)
November 4, 2019 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (Davis, Derek)
November 1, 2019 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot Product Authority LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot Product Authority LLC. (Ewert, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant Ellis County Sheriff Charles Edge now moves to dismiss the claims asserted against him in that complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Edge's deadline to serve a responsive pleading to the amended complaint is stayed pending the Court's disposition of its motion. Cledera must file a written response to the motion by 12/2/2019. Edge may file a reply brief, but no additional documents, by 12/17/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/31/2019) (ykp)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Cledera must file a written response to the motion by 11/29/2019. Verizon may file a reply brief, but no additional documents by 12/16/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/30/2019) (aaa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charles Edge. (Montgomery, D)
October 30, 2019 Filing 50 Defendant Ellis County Sheriff Charles Edge Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support. Modified text and event type on 11/1/2019 (ykp).
October 29, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by Verizon Communications Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Tab H Keener added to party Verizon Communications Inc(pty:dft) (Keener, Tab)
October 25, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LG Electronics USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics USA Inc. (Taylor, Jana)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 11/25/2109. Replies due by 12/10/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/25/2019) (epm)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: #43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #41 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/25/2019. Replies due by 12/10/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/24/2019) (epm)
October 24, 2019 Filing 45 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Home Depot Product Authority LLC re #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ewert, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Home Depot Product Authority LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert A Ewert added to party Home Depot Product Authority LLC(pty:dft) (Ewert, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gary C Thomas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Harold R McKeever added to party Gary C Thomas(pty:dft) (McKeever, Harold)
October 23, 2019 Filing 42 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Steven C McCraw re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) & (6) (Warren, Kelsey)
October 23, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) & (6) filed by Steven C McCraw Attorney Kelsey Warren added to party Steven C McCraw(pty:dft) (Warren, Kelsey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Aten Lamberson on behalf of HomePro Operating LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lamberson, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Cledera must file written responses to the motions by 11/20/2019. The moving defendants may file reply briefs, but no additional documents, by 12/5/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/21/2019) (ykp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc). (Howton, Skyler)
October 18, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc) with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Skyler Michelle Howton added to party ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc)(pty:dft) (Howton, Skyler)
October 18, 2019 Filing 36 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tracy Aaron, City of Mansfield. (Jeffrey, James) Modified title on 10/28/2019 (awc).
October 18, 2019 Filing 35 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Grand Prairie, Steve Dye, Robert Fite. (Jeffrey, James) Modified title on 10/28/2019 (awc).
October 18, 2019 Filing 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous () filed by City of Mansfield with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney James T Jeffrey, Jr added to party City of Mansfield(pty:dft) (Jeffrey, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous () filed by City of Grand Prairie with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney James T Jeffrey, Jr added to party City of Grand Prairie(pty:dft) (Jeffrey, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and (12)(b)(6) filed by LG Electronics USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Jana H Taylor added to party LG Electronics USA Inc(pty:dft) (Taylor, Jana)
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Best Buy Co Inc, Target Corporation. (Peavler, Donna)
October 18, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HomePro Operating LLC. (Coles, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HomePro Operating LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Michael E Coles added to party HomePro Operating LLC(pty:dft) (Coles, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dominique Artis, U Renee Hall. (Wilson, Tatia)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dominique Artis, U Renee Hall with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Tatia R Wilson added to party Dominique Artis(pty:dft), Attorney Tatia R Wilson added to party U Renee Hall(pty:dft) (Wilson, Tatia)
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ryan Holt. (Barrett, Roy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc), served on 9/26/2019; Tracy Aaron, served on 9/27/2019; Apple Inc, served on 9/25/2019; Dominique Artis, served on 10/9/2019; William Barr, served on 9/25/2019; Best Buy Co Inc, served on 9/25/2019; Steve Dye, served on 9/27/2019; Charles Edge, served on 10/10/2019; Robert Fit, served on 9/27/2019; U Renee Hall, served on 9/26/2019; Ryan Holt, served on 9/27/2019; Home Depot Product Authority LLC, served on 10/3/2019; LG Electronics USA Inc, served on 9/30/2019; Kevin K McAleenan, served on 10/2/2019; RING (Amazon.com Inc), served on 9/27/2019; Target Corporation, served on 9/25/2019; Gary C Thomas, served on 10/8/2019; Verizon Communications Inc, served on 10/11/2019; Walmart Inc, served on 9/25/2019; U.S Attorney General; U.S. Attorney. (axm)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Cledera must file a written response to the motion by 11/15/2019. The Waco Defendants may file a reply brief, but no additional documents, by 12/2/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/16/2019) (mla)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Cledera must file a written response to the motion by 11/15/2019. Best Buy and Target may file a joint reply brief, but no additional documents, by 12/2/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/16/2019) (aaa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Walmart Inc re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Davis, Derek)
October 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Walmart Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Derek S Davis added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft) (Davis, Derek)
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tracy Aaron. (Jeffrey, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Tracy Aaron with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney James T Jeffrey, Jr added to party Tracy Aaron(pty:dft). (Jeffrey, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steve Dye, Robert Fite. (Jeffrey, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Steve Dye, Robert Fite with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney James T Jeffrey, Jr added to party Steve Dye(pty:dft), and Robert Fite(pty:dft). (Jeffrey, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Best Buy Co Inc, Target Corporation Attorney Donna C Peavler added to party Best Buy Co Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Donna C Peavler added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft) (Peavler, Donna)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: re: #11 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/15/2019. Reply Brief due by 11/25/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/15/2019) (ndt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ryan Holt re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(c), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(5) (Barrett, Roy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(c), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(5) filed by Ryan Holt Attorney Roy Lee Barrett added to party Ryan Holt(pty:dft) (Barrett, Roy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc. (Cochran, William)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Apple Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cochran, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc), LG Electronics USA Inc, RING (Amazon.com Inc), Verizon Communications Inc. Hand-delivered over the counter. (mla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera. (mla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc), Tracy Aaron, Apple Inc, Dominique Artis, William Barr, Best Buy Co Inc, Steve Dye, Charles Edge, Gregory Fellows, Robert Fite, U Renee Hall, Ryan Holt, Home Depot Product Authority LLC, HomePro Operating LLC, Will Johnson, LG Electronics USA Inc, Brian Manley, Kevin K McAleenan, Steven C McCraw, James McHenry, RING (Amazon.com Inc), Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Gary C Thomas, United States, Verizon Communications, Walmart Inc filed by Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDMENT by Robert Paul M Cledera. Amendment to #3 Complaint. (axm)
August 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,5,6. Wed Aug 21 14:52:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, James McHenry, United States, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (axm) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/22/2019) (mla).
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ARLO (Netgear Inc), Tracy Aaron, Apple Inc, Dominique Artis, Best Buy Co Inc, Steve Dye, Charles Edge, Gregory Fellows, Robert Fite, U Renee Hall, Ryan Holt, Home Depot Product Authority LLC, HomePro Operating LLC, Will Johnson, LG Corp, Brian Manley, Steven C McCraw, RING (Amazon Inc), Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Gary C Thomas, Verizon Communications, Walmart Inc. (axm) Modified on 8/21/2019 (axm). (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/22/2019) (mla).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Robert Paul M Cledera. (axm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against AG EOIR, ARLO (Netgear Inc), Tracy Aaron, Apple Inc, Dominique Artis, William Barr, Best Buy Co Inc, Steve Dye, Charles Edge, Gregory Fellows, Robert Fite, U Renee Hall, Ryan Holt, Home Depot Product Authority LLC, HomePro Operating LLC, Will Johnson, LG Corp, Brian Manley, Kevin K McAleenan, Steven C. McCraw, James McHenry, RING (Amazon Inc), Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Gary C Thomas, United States filed by Robert Paul M Cledera. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS118409) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/21/2019) (axm).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cledera v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RING (Amazon Inc)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Edge
Represented By: D Randall Montgomery
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Barreneche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Dye
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARLO (Netgear Inc)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Aaron
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Fellows
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Scott
Represented By: David R Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Artis
Represented By: Tatia R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG EOIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Aaron George Stendell
Represented By: Derek S Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fite
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary C Thomas
Represented By: Harold R McKeever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Donna C Peavler
Represented By: Anthony M Kuehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Manley
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U Renee Hall
Represented By: Tatia R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co Inc
Represented By: Donna C Peavler
Represented By: Anthony M Kuehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Christopher Boeck
Represented By: Thomas Allan Connop
Represented By: Harriet Ellan Miers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Product Authority LLC
Represented By: Robert A Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: William Gray Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Holt
Represented By: Joe Anthony Rivera
Represented By: Roy Lee Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Johnson
Represented By: Robert H Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomePro Operating LLC
Represented By: Michael E Coles
Represented By: Elizabeth Aten Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARLO (Arlo Technologies Inc)
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mansfield
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc
Represented By: Tab H Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA Inc
Represented By: Jana H Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Grand Prairie
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C McCraw
Represented By: Kelsey Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RING (Amazon.com Inc)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menifee Police Department
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Scott
Represented By: David R Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Paul M Cledera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Paul Magtulis Cledera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?