Energy Intelligence Group Inc et al v. Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited and Energy Intelligence Group Inc
Defendant: Barrow, Hanley, Mewhinney & Strauss, LLC and Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02001
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 1/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2020. Motions due by 7/21/2020. Discovery due by 6/21/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/22/2020. Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/10/2019) (aaa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 to Joint Status Report (Protocols for the Production of ESI)) (Ankrom, Stephen)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James M. Gibson. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/25/2019) (chmb)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Powley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/25/2019) (chmb)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen M. Ankrom. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/25/2019) (chmb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney James M. Gibson (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10287629) filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Klemchuk, Darin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Robert L. Powley (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10287581) filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Klemchuk, Darin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Stephen M. Ankrom (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10287543) filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Klemchuk, Darin)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/18/2019) (axm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate BrightSphere Investment Group Inc. for Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC. (Cohen, Justin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cohen, Justin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Marguerite Cooley on behalf of Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cooley, Natalie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S Cohen on behalf of Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cohen, Justin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC ; served on 8/27/2019. (epm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC. (zkc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group Inc. (Klemchuk, Darin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (zkc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Koeing Limited for Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Klemchuk, Darin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Barrow, Hanley, Mewhinney & Strauss, LLC filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10205773) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet) (Klemchuk, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Intelligence Group Inc et al v. Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.
Represented By: Darin M Klemchuk
Represented By: Mandi M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Represented By: Darin M Klemchuk
Represented By: Mandi M Phillips
Represented By: James M Gibson
Represented By: Robert L Powley
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Ankrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group Inc
Represented By: Darin M Klemchuk
Represented By: Mandi M Phillips
Represented By: James M Gibson
Represented By: Robert L Powley
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Ankrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrow, Hanley, Mewhinney & Strauss, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrow Hanley Mewhinney & Strauss LLC
Represented By: Justin S Cohen
Represented By: Natalie Marguerite Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?