Barela v. Underwood
Plaintiff: Juan Lorenzo Barela, Jr
Defendant: Warden Martha Underwood and M Underwood
Case Number: 3:2019cv02033
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per Order at Docket 8 . (cea)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Upon review, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Termination of Case, Doc. #7 , meets the requirements for voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (providing that a plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment). Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/23/2019) (chmb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion for Termination of Case filed by Juan Lorenzo Barela, Jr (ykp)
September 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 3 11:05:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Juan Lorenzo Barela, Jr must address the following deficiency: submit (1) a civil rights complaint on the Court-approved form, and (2) a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or the $400.00 filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide to Plaintiff with service of this Order, a prisoner in forma pauperis application and a standard form complaint for filing civil rights cases (labeled "amended"). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 9/27/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/30/2019) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form, #2 IFP Form) (axm)
August 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Aug 27 12:00:19 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 27, 2019 ***DISREGARD*** ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. 5 Tue Aug 27 09:09:31 CDT 2019 (crt) Modified on 8/27/2019 (mla).
August 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Aug 26 13:51:37 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SEVERING CLAIMS: Barela construed civil rights claims are SEVERED from this action habeas action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to open a new civil rights case for the now-severed civil rights claims and file a copy of this order and the section 2241 petition in the new case (NOS 550 directly assigned, per Special Order 3-250, to the same District Judge and Magistrate Judge). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/23/2019) (ndt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Martha Underwood filed by Juan Lorenzo Barela, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barela v. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lorenzo Barela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Martha Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?