National Rifle Association of America v. Ackerman McQueen Inc et al
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America
Defendant: Mercury Group Inc, Henry Martin and Jesse Greenberg
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Ackerman McQueen Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02074
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ackerman McQueen Inc, Jesse Greenberg, Henry Martin filed by National Rifle Association of America. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Collins, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by National Rifle Association of America. Related document: #12 Answer to Complaint,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,, (Collins, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C McKenney on behalf of National Rifle Association of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McKenney, Jason)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for plaintiff NRA to amend its complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and respond to defendant Ackerman McQueen, Inc.'s counterclaim and third-party complaint, is EXTENDED from October 22, 2019, to October 25, 2019. Plaintiff NRA's deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss filed pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), is EXTENDED from October 22, 2019, to October 29, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/22/2019) (aaa)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time of deadlines filed by National Rifle Association of America (Collins, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ackerman McQueen Inc. (Madrid, Jay)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Ackerman McQueen's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ackerman McQueen Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against National Rifle Association of America filed by Ackerman McQueen Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. First COUNTERCLAIM against National Rifle Association of America filed by Ackerman McQueen Inc. Attorney Jay J Madrid added to party Ackerman McQueen Inc (pty:dft). (Madrid, Jay) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (rekc).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by Ackerman McQueen Inc, Jesse Greenberg, Henry Martin, Mercury Group Inc re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5) (Vanderwoude, J)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ackerman McQueen Inc, Jesse Greenberg, Henry Martin, Mercury Group Inc re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Vanderwoude, J)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ackerman McQueen Inc, Jesse Greenberg, Henry Martin, Mercury Group Inc (Vanderwoude, J)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jesse Greenberg, served on 9/10/2019; Henry Martin, served on 9/10/2019. (axm)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ackerman McQueen Inc, served on 9/6/2019; Mercury Group Inc, served on 9/6/2019. (axm)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR*** MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motions to dismiss to the extent venue in this District is improper. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motions as to dismissing this action for improper venue. In the interest of justice, the Court hereby transfers this case to the Western District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/3/2019) (aaa) Modified docket text on 9/5/2019 (aaa).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/3/2019) (axm)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Rifle Association of America. (Collins, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ackerman McQueen Inc, Jesse Greenberg, Henry Martin, Mercury Group Inc. (sre)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by National Rifle Association of America. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10230413) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Collins, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Rifle Association of America v. Ackerman McQueen Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Group Inc
Represented By: J Brian Vanderwoude
Represented By: Christina M Carroll
Represented By: Douglas Steward Lang
Represented By: Jay J Madrid,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Martin
Represented By: J Brian Vanderwoude
Represented By: Christina M Carroll
Represented By: Douglas Steward Lang
Represented By: Jay J Madrid,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Greenberg
Represented By: J Brian Vanderwoude
Represented By: Christina M Carroll
Represented By: Douglas Steward Lang
Represented By: Jay J Madrid,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ackerman McQueen Inc
Represented By: Jay J Madrid
Represented By: J Brian Vanderwoude
Represented By: Christina M Carroll
Represented By: Douglas Steward Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America
Represented By: Michael J Collins
Represented By: William A Brewer, III
Represented By: Jason C McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?