Jones v. Hutto et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Jerome Jones
Defendant: D Muniz, Bullet, NFN Reed, K Hutto, B Johnson and C Ferrell
Case Number: 3:2019cv02077
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. with copies of 9 & 10 Mon Oct 28 08:36:14 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot Plaintiff's motions to amend, Doc. #11 & Doc. #12 . On October 8, 2019, the Court dismissed this action as barred by the three-strike provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). See Doc. #9 & Doc. #10 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/25/2019) (chmb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Permission to get Last of Such Dimissal with Prejudice and to Amend Complaint filed by Kevin Jerome Jones (rekc)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (rekc)
October 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. Tue Oct 8 16:10:38 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED as barred by the three-strike provision. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/8/2019) (epm)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Accepting #6 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED as barred by the three-strike provision. The Court DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiff's Motions to Amend Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/8/2019) (epm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct with Warden Hutto Official of Forcing Me to Have Cellmate #3 Complaint, filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (ndt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct and Replace Personal Property #3 Complaint, filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (ndt)
September 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Sep 16 14:36:19 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is recommended that Jones' motion #4 to proceed in forma pauperis should be DENIED and this action should be summarily DISMISSED as barred by the three-strike provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Such dismissal is with prejudice to the refiling of an in forma pauperis lawsuit raising the same claims as herein presented, but without prejudice to the refiling of this lawsuit with full payment of the $400.00 filing and administrative fee. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/16/2019) (mcrd)
August 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri Aug 30 16:29:24 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration in Support filed by Kevin Jerome Jones re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Kevin Jerome Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Bullet, C Ferrell, K Hutto, B Johnson, D Muniz, NFN Reed filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party.. (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hutto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Hutto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jerome Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?