Luevano v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Jaime Luevano
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2019cv02114
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend in General filed by Jaime Luevano. (axm)
September 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Sep 9 15:00:32 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice that the clerk has been instructed to apply the attached sanction order to the submissions indexed under number: 3:19-cv-02114. The sanction order was originally filed in 5:11-cv-131-OG in the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division -- In any future civil pleading Jaime Luevano files or attempts to file in any US District Court to open a civil case, he must state that this court imposed a $100 sanction, he must state that he is barred from filing documents with the US District Court for the Western District of Texas until this sanction is paid, and he must state whether he has paid the sanction. That order prohibits the filing of a case, so the number assigned to this closed matter remains for indexing purposes only. (twd)
September 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,3. Thu Sep 5 16:31:39 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus/Emergency Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Jaime Luevano. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) Modified file date on 9/5/2019 (sre).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luevano v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Luevano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?