DOT Compliance Group LLC v. Compliance Processing Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: DOT Compliance Group, LLC
Defendant: Robert Corrigan, Compliance Processing Group LLC and Brandi Shelley
Case Number: 3:2019cv02151
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RETURN OF BOND AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF: After considering Plaintiff's Motion for Return of Bond and Brief in Support Thereof, the Court FINDS that there is no threat of irreparable injury to Defendants and ORDERS the U.S. District Clerk to return the security bond in the amount of $1,000 to Plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/10/2019) (ndt)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS the Motion and dissolves the Agreed Temporary Restraining Order and dismisses the case with prejudice. All court costs are to be borne by the party incurring same. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/10/2019) (ndt)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation filed by DOT Compliance Group LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wehrmann, Henry)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by DOT Compliance Group LLC re #16 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice and Request to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order. (Wehrmann, Henry) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (mla).
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice and Request to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order by DOT Compliance Group LLC. (Wehrmann, Henry) Modified event on 10/4/2019 (mla).
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 Bond posted by Compliance Processing Group LLC, Robert Corrigan, Brandi Shelley. (axm)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Orders the clerk to issue notice to Defendants, Compliance Processing Group LLC, Robert Corrigan, and Brandi Shelley, that the hearing on plaintiff's application for temporary injunction is set for 11/6/2019, at 10 a.m. The purpose of the hearing will be to determine whether this temporary restraining order should be made a temporary injunction pending a full trial on the merits. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/24/2019) (aaa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Compliance Processing Group LLC, Robert Corrigan, Brandi Shelley re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Callahan, Daniel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF WITH JURY DEMAND against Compliance Processing Group LLC, Robert Corrigan, Brandi Shelley filed by DOT Compliance Group LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/20/2019) (chmb)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER; The Court ORDERS the defendant to respond by 5:00 p.m. on September 23, 2019 to the plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining order, Doc.No. #6 . (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/20/2019) (chmb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DOT Compliance Group LLC. (Wehrmann, Henry)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Original Petition and Verified Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by DOT Compliance Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to Motion for Leave to Amend) (Wehrmann, Henry)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by DOT Compliance Group LLC re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Wehrmann, Henry)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DOT Compliance Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to Motion for TRO, #2 Exhibit(s) B to Motion for TRO) (Wehrmann, Henry)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DOT Compliance Group LLC. (Wehrmann, Henry)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: The referral judge for this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan is no longer assigned to the case. (ctf)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Compliance Processing Group LLC, Robert Corrigan, Brandi Shelley. (Rubin, Howard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 160th Judicial District, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-13858 filed by Brandi Shelley, Robert Corrigan, Compliance Processing Group LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10257273) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Callahan, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOT Compliance Group LLC v. Compliance Processing Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Corrigan
Represented By: Barrett A Stern
Represented By: Howard C Rubin
Represented By: Daniel P Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compliance Processing Group LLC
Represented By: Barrett A Stern
Represented By: Howard C Rubin
Represented By: Daniel P Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Shelley
Represented By: Barrett A Stern
Represented By: Howard C Rubin
Represented By: Daniel P Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOT Compliance Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Elam
Represented By: Henry Scott Wehrmann
Represented By: Julie E Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?