Glidewell v. Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Robin Glidewell
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 3:2019cv02163
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (chmb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mathisen, Eric)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Leslie on behalf of Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Leslie, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/13/2019) (rekc)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, Defendant, Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result defendant's pleadings being stricken and default taken against that defendant without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/13/2019) (chmb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00210. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
August 13, 2019 NOTICE the Scheduling Conference set for August 14, 2019 is CANCELLED. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/2/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue Transfer Venue and Brief in Support by Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Alaniz v. Liberty Life Order re venue change, #2 Hughes v. Liberty Life Order re venue change, #3 Jones v. Hartford Order re venue change, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathisen, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #5 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 02:10 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada.(Mathisen, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada identifying Corporate Parent Sun Life Financial Inc. for Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada. (Mathisen, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada (Mathisen, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
June 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
June 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7295521.), filed by Robin Glidewell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glidewell v. Sun Life Insurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Glidewell
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Eric P Mathisen
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Bryant
Represented By: Jeffrey Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?