United States of America v. Multi Care Home Health Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Gloria Wilson, Multi Care Home Health Services, LLC and Multi Care Home Health Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02167
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Tue Oct 29 17:29:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION BY CONSENT. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/29/2019) (axm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Permanent Injuction by Consent filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order signed by the parties to indicate consent) (May, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Multi Care Home Health Services LLC ; served on 9/20/2019; Gloria Wilson ; served on 9/20/2019. (May, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under the authority of 28 U.S.C. 636(b), this case is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford for hearing, if necessary, and recommendation. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/20/2019) (aaa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Multi Care Home Health Services LLC, Gloria Wilson. (sre)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Gloria Wilson, #2 Summons for Multi Care Home Health Services, LLC) (May, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States. (May, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (May, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Multi Care Home Health Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Michael W May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael W May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Wilson
Represented By: Garrett Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi Care Home Health Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi Care Home Health Services LLC
Represented By: Garrett Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?