Retail Ready Career Center Inc v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Retail Ready Career Center Inc
Defendant: United States of America and Miguel Coias
Case Number: 3:2019cv02204
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Miguel Coias, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Juliana MacPherson Barrett added to party Miguel Coias(pty:dft), Attorney Juliana MacPherson Barrett added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (Barrett, Juliana)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed US Attorney General; served on 9/24/2019. (sre)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Miguel Coias ; served on 9/19/2019. (sre)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney (Miguel Coias) served on 9/18/2019; US Attorney (United States of America) served on 9/18/2019. (sre) Modified docket text on 9/24/2019 (sre).
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for all further proceedings. (cea)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Miguel Coias, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sre)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Retail Ready Career Center Inc. (Ternan, Jack)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Miguel Coias, Unites States of America filed by Retail Ready Career Center Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10266397) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Case) (Ternan, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retail Ready Career Center Inc v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retail Ready Career Center Inc
Represented By: Jack GB Ternan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Juliana MacPherson Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Coias
Represented By: Juliana MacPherson Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?