The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation, ABB Inc, General Electric Company, Electric Insurance Agency LLC, ABB Holdings Inc, Electric Insurance Company and ABB Ltd
Case Number: 3:2019cv02248
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 CROSSCLAIM OF WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION against General Electric Company filed by Whirlpool Corporation (Borofsky, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kyle W. LeClere. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/12/2019) (chmb)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for Court's three-week docket beginning 6/7/2021 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 3/6/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2020. Motions due by 1/18/2021. Discovery due by 11/2/2020. Settlement Status Report due by 5/6/2020. Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 5/17/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/7/2019) (aaa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Borofsky, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kyle W. LeClere (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10388740) filed by Whirlpool Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Borofsky, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 10/30/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/6/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/17/2019) (ykp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Whirlpool Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate PRIMECAP Management Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc. for Whirlpool Corporation. (Borofsky, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Whirlpool Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael H Borofsky added to party Whirlpool Corporation(pty:dft) (Borofsky, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Whirlpool Corporation ; served on 9/24/2019. (sre)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ABB Holdings Inc ; served on 9/24/2019. (sre)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ABB Inc ; served on 9/24/2019; Electric Insurance Company ; served on 9/24/2019; General Electric Company ; served on 9/24/2019. (sre)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ABB Holdings Inc, ABB Inc, ABB Ltd, Electric Insurance Agency LLC, Electric Insurance Company, General Electric Company, Whirlpool Corporation. (sre)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against General Electric Company, Electric Insurance Agency, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Electric Insurance Company, ABB Inc., ABB Holdings, Inc., ABB Ltd. filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, as Subrogee for Stacey Koehler. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10278067) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration(s)) (Ramos, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A LeClere
Represented By: Michael H Borofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Insurance Agency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven T Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?