McDougal v. Trinity Financial Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Davida McDougal
Defendant: Trinity Financial Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2, Trinity Financial Services LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv02256
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. (Clerk to send Consent Form as directed.) If appropriate, party(ies) should return the signed consent form to the clerk. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/30/2019) (ndt)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/25/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/28/2019) (ndt)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, Trinity Financial Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Browne, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants' #3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' response is due by October 25, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/24/2019) (chmb)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DUPLICATE ENTRY.*** ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants' #3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' response is due by October 25, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/22/2019) (chmb) Modified on 10/24/2019 (ali).
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (sre)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2, Trinity Financial Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Max)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2, Trinity Financial Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2. (Murphy, Max)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 1, Dallas County, case number CC-19-03859-A filed by Trinity Financial Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10279480) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Cover Sheet, #13 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Browne, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDougal v. Trinity Financial Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Ryan J Browne
Represented By: Max M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as Sucessor to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee for RASC2004-KS2
Represented By: Ryan J Browne
Represented By: Max M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Ryan J Browne
Represented By: Max M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association
Represented By: Ryan J Browne
Represented By: Max M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davida McDougal
Represented By: Jason Andrew LeBoeuf
Represented By: Robert C Vilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?