Wilson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Demond Wilson
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2019cv02260
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 Acknowledgment from Office of Texas Attorney General re: #8 Electronic Service of documents. (ndt)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's notice of Electronic Notification to the Office of Attorney General of Texas. (ykp)
September 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Sep 25 11:43:28 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. As provided by Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts (the "Rules"), the respondent must file an Answer that complies with Rule 5(b) within SIXTY DAYS of the date of service of this Order. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/24/2019) (ykp)
September 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 24 12:15:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the petitioner's #4 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/24/2019) (mcrd)
September 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Sep 23 10:41:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Demond Wilson re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sre)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Demond Wilson. (sre)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Demond Wilson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demond Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?