Federal Trade Commission v. Match Group Inc
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC and Match.com LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02281
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information of B. Mundel (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Bragg, Tayler)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #185 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin M Mundel. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/2/2023) (chmb)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13559245) filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Benjamin M Mundel added to party Match Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin M Mundel added to party Match Group LLC(pty:dft) (Mundel, Benjamin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s ("MGI") Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order (Doc. No. 175) and Appendix in support (Doc. No. 176) (together, the "Objection"). Defendant MGI's objections are overruled, and Magistrate Judge Ramirez's order is affirmed in all respects. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/5/2023) (chmb)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc re #182 Reply (Zambrano, Angela)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 REPLY filed by Match Group Inc re: #164 Order on Motion to Compel, (Zambrano, Angela)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Appendix in Support filed by Federal Trade Commission re #180 Response/Objection (Tepfer, Reid)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #175 Objection/Response to Magistrate Judge Order,, (Tepfer, Reid)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Motion to Compel (#133) Proceedings held on 11/08/2022 before Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (79 pages). Redaction Request due 12/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2023. (Rehling, Kathy)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: BENCH TRIAL set for 4/1/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Discovery due by 7/28/2023. Motions due by 9/11/2023. Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 3/4/2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/16/2022) (chmb)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #172 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Deadlines and Continue Trial Date. A separate Scheduling Order shall issue. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/16/2022) (chmb)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc re #175 Objection/Response to Magistrate Judge Order,, (Zambrano, Angela)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 OBJECTION to a Magistrate Judge Order #164 ORDER re: #140 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. Based on the relevant filings, applicable law, and argument, and for the reasons stated on the record, the motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/1/2022) (mcrd) . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER re: #133 Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Federal Trade Commission. Based on the relevant filings, applicable law, and argument, and for the reasons stated on the record, the motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/8/2022) (mcrd)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Hearing held on 11/8/2022 re: #133 Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Federal Trade Commission. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Reid Tepfer, M Hasan Aijaz; Defense - Angela Zambrano, Chad Hummel, Chelsea Priest, Tayler Bragg. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:00. (mcrd)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Deadlines and Continue Trial Date filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tepfer, Reid)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ELECTRONIC ORDER deeming #152 Motion for Protective Order WITHDRAWN based on the filing of Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for A Protective Order (Dkt. 152), filed on 11/7/2022. (See doc. 169.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/7/2022) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ELECTRONIC ORDER Deeming #160 Motion for Protective Order WITHDRAWN based on Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for A Protective Order (Dkt. 160), filed 11/7/22. (See doc. 168.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/7/2022) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order re: #152 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order re: #160 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Motions to Compel (#133, #140) Proceedings held on 11/01/2022 before Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (59 pages). Redaction Request due 11/25/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2023. (Rehling, Kathy) (Main Document 167 replaced on 11/8/2022) (twd).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER re: #160 Defendants Match Group, Inc. and Match Group, LLC's Motion for a Protective Order. Counsel for the parties to the dispute are hereby ORDERED to meet face-to-face to fully confer on each of the items in dispute. Agreed proposed order or joint submission due by 11/21/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/3/2022) (mcrd)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion. The Court REFERS Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. No. 160) to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for determination and a hearing, if necessary. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/1/2022) (chmb)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER re: #140 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. Based on the relevant filings, applicable law, and argument, and for the reasons stated on the record, the motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/1/2022) (mcrd)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ELECTRONIC ORDER re: #133 Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Federal Trade Commission; and #152 Defendants Match Group, Inc. and Match Group, LLC's Motion for Protective Order and Brief in Support. An oral argument has been scheduled for 11/8/2022 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1566, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. Unless otherwise ordered, the motions will be determined based on the relevant filings. No evidence will be received at the oral argument. Counsel must confirm their attendance at least two days prior to the hearing by contacting Courtroom Deputy Marie Gonzales at Marie_Gonzales@txnd.uscourts.gov. Failure to confirm or to attend the hearing without obtaining permission of the Court will result in appropriate sanctions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/1/2022) (mcrd)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Hearing held on 11/1/2022 re: #140 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Reid Tepfer, M Hasan Aijaz; Defense - Angela C Zambrano, Chad S Hummel,Chelsea Ann Priest,Tayler G Bragg. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:22. (mcrd)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC re #160 MOTION for Protective Order (Zambrano, Angela)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ***WITHDRAWN PER #168 NOTICE of Withdrawal*** MOTION for Protective Order filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela) Modified docket text on 11/7/2022 (oyh).
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC re #158 Notice (Other) (Zambrano, Angela)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Joint Submission of Defendants Motion for a Protective Order filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ELECTRONIC ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time (Doc. No. 150). Plaintiff requests the Court extend all remaining deadlines in this case by three (3) months. Plaintiff argues good cause exists for these extensions because of discovery-related issues and disputes, certain of which have been referred to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. The Court DENIES without prejudice to refiling Plaintiff's Motion. Once Judge Ramirez has decided these discovery disputes, Plaintiff may move for extensions of specific deadlines arguably affected by any ruling or delay, and such motion must demonstrate the required good cause. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/5/2022) (chmb)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ELECTRONIC ORDER re: #133 Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Federal Trade Commission; and #140 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. An oral argument has been scheduled for 11/1/2022 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1566, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. Unless otherwise ordered, the motion will be determined based on the relevant filings. No evidence will be received at the oral argument. Counsel must confirm their attendance at least two days prior to the hearing by contacting Courtroom Deputy Marie Gonzales at Marie_Gonzales@txnd.uscourts.gov. Failure to confirm or to attend the hearing without obtaining permission of the Court will result in appropriate sanctions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/4/2022) (mcrd)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re: #152 Defendants Match Group, Inc. and Match Group, LLC's Motion for Protective Order and Brief in Support. Counsel for the parties to the dispute are hereby ORDERED to meet face-to-face to fully confer on each of the items in dispute. Agreed proposed order or joint submission due by 10/11/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/4/2022) (mcrd)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ELECTRONIC Order The Court hereby refers Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. No. 152) to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for hearing, if necessary, and determination. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/4/2022) (chmb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC re #152 MOTION for Protective Order (Zambrano, Angela)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ***WITHDRAWN PER #169 NOTICE of Withdrawal*** MOTION for Protective Order filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela) Modified docket text on 11/7/2022 (oyh).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Appendix in Support filed by Federal Trade Commission re #150 MOTION to Extend Time for All Deadlines (Tepfer, Reid)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION to Extend Time for All Deadlines filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tepfer, Reid)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Amended Joint Submission on Discovery Matters (correcting omission of counsel's signature) by Federal Trade Commission. Related document: #143 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, #147 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Appendix in Support filed by Federal Trade Commission re #147 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters (Tepfer, Reid)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters by Federal Trade Commission. Related document: #143 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,. (Tepfer, Reid)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Verified Stipulation Regarding Permanently Discontinued Practices on Match.com filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc re #144 JOINT SUBMISSION ON DEFENDANT MATCH GROUP, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Zambrano, Angela) Modified on 9/14/2022 (chmb).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 JOINT SUBMISSION ON DEFENDANT MATCH GROUP, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Zambrano, Angela) Modified on 9/14/2022 (chmb).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re: #140 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. Counsel for the parties to the dispute are hereby ORDERED to meet face-to-face to fully confer on each of the items in dispute. Agreed proposed order or joint submission due by 9/21/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/7/2022) (mcrd)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion The Court refers Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. (Doc. No. 140) to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for hearing, if necessary, and determination. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/7/2022) (chmb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Appendix in Support filed by Federal Trade Commission re #140 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. (Tepfer, Reid)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses from Defendant Match Group, Inc. filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tepfer, Reid)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 AMENDED ANSWER to #116 Amended Complaint,, filed by Match Group LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Defendants Match Group, Inc. (MGI) and Match Group, LLC's (MGL") Unopposed Motion to Withdraw David Y. Sillers and Anna Tutundjian as Counsel (the Motion), for MGI and MGL. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that David Y. Sillers and Anna Tutundjian are withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants MGI and MGL. The Clerk's Office is directed to turn off all CM/ECF notifications to David Y. Sillers and Anna Tutundjian in this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/1/2022) (chmb)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re: #133 Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Federal Trade Commission. Counsel for the parties to the dispute are hereby ORDERED to meet face-to-face to fully confer on each of the items in dispute. Agreed proposed order or joint submission due by 9/13/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/30/2022) (mcrd)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion The Court refers Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Federal Trade Commission (Doc. No. 133) to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for hearing, if necessary, and determination. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/30/2022) (chmb)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc re #133 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from FTC (Zambrano, Angela)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from FTC filed by Match Group Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/29/2022) (chmb)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/29/2022) (chmb)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Entry of Stipulations Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Confidential Materials re #126 Stipulation, #127 Stipulation filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group, LLC (Zambrano, Angela)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ELECTRONIC ORDER Before the Court is Defendant Match Group, LLC's ("MGLLC") Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. NO. 123). As Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission previously represented to the Court, it does not oppose Defendant MGLLC's partial motion to dismiss Counts I and II on the same grounds as the Court previously dismissed those claims as to Defendant Match Group Inc. See Resp. (Doc. No. 128) at 2 (reaffirming its intention to preserve its appellate rights but indicating it does not oppose dismissal of these claims); see also Pl.'s Reply (Doc. No. 110) at 7. Accordingly, applying the same analysis and reasoning in its prior Memorandum Opinion and Order (Doc. No. 115), the Court GRANTS Defendant MGLLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Count I and Count II as barred by Section 230 of the Communications Decency Act. Count I and Count II are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/24/2022) (chmb)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #123 MOTION to Dismiss (Hilliard, Erica)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Proposed STIPULATION **Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Materials** by Match Group Inc, Match Group, LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Proposed STIPULATION **Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information** by Match Group Inc, Match Group, LLC. (Zambrano, Angela)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Match Group Inc, Match Group, LLC (Bragg, Tayler)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ANSWER to #116 Amended Complaint,, filed by Match Group, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Zambrano, Angela)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Match Group, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 AMENDED ANSWER to #116 Amended Complaint,, filed by Match Group Inc (Zambrano, Angela)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chelsea Ann Priest on behalf of Match Group Inc, Match Group, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Priest, Chelsea)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tayler G Bragg on behalf of Match Group Inc, Match Group, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bragg, Tayler)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Match Group, LLC ; served on 7/22/2022. (Aijaz, M)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Summons Issued as to Match Group, LLC. (ykp)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Aijaz, M)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Federal Trade Commission. Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Aijaz, M)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER - Before the Court is Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Amend its Complaint and Add Defendant (Doc. No. 107). Defendant Match Group, Inc. filed its Response in Opposition (Doc. No. 109) and Plaintiff filed its Reply (Doc. No. 110). For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motion to permit Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission ("Plaintiff") to add Match Group, LLC ("Match LLC") as a defendant. The Court, however, DENIES Plaintiff leave to amend its complaint to reallege Count I and Count II against Defendant Match Group, Inc. because those claims have been dismissed with prejudice. In accordance with this Order, Plaintiff may file its amended complaint that omits allegations against Defendant Match Group, Inc. under Count I and Count II by July 20, 2022. No additional changes to the proposed amended complaint may be made unless Plaintiff chooses to omit Count I and Count II altogether. If Plaintiff fails to file its amended complaint in compliance with this Order, the Court will strike it without further notice and the original complaint will remain the operative pleading. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/13/2022) (chmb) (Main Document 115 replaced on 7/13/2022) (chmb).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Rollins Hilliard on behalf of Federal Trade Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hilliard, Erica)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEDIATION REPORT filed by Match Group Inc. (Zambrano, Angela) Modified text on 6/8/2022 (ykp).
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Appendix in Support filed by Federal Trade Commission re #110 Reply (Zuckerman, Sarah)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #107 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Federal Trade Commissions Motion To Amend Its Complaint And Add Defendant) (Zuckerman, Sarah)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE filed by Match Group Inc re: #107 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Federal Trade Commissions Motion To Amend Its Complaint And Add Defendant) (Attachments: #1 Appendix In Support of Response) (Zambrano, Angela)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission filed its Motion to Amend its Complaint and Add Defendant (Doc. No. 107) on May 13, 2022. The Court hereby ORDERS the following expedited responsive deadlines to this Motion: Defendant Match Group, Inc. must file its response by May 20, 2022, and Plaintiff must file its reply by May 24, 2022. No extensions of these deadlines will be granted absent good cause shown regardless of any agreement between the parties. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/17/2022) (chmb)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Federal Trade Commissions Motion To Amend Its Complaint And Add Defendant) filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 (FTC's First Amended Complaint), #2 Proposed Order) (Tepfer, Reid)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement conference conducted with the parties. Case did not settle. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/11/2022) (jmg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #102 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John R. O'Gorman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/10/2022) (chmb)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information for John R. O'Gorman (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Federal Trade Commission (O'Gorman, John)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Reeve O'Gorman on behalf of Federal Trade Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (O'Gorman, John)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney John Reeve O'Gorman added to party Federal Trade Commission(pty:pla) (O'Gorman, John)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #97 Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Strike. In its Motion, Defendant asks the Court to strike Paragraphs 68 through 73 of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Complaint. These paragraphs allege Counts I and II which this Court previously dismissed with prejudice. See Mem. Op. and Order (Doc. No. 86). Accordingly, Defendant argues "there is no reason for Match to substantively respond to Paragraphs 68 through 73" and the Court should strike these paragraphs which "refer solely to claims already dismissed." Mot. at 1. A district court "may strike from a pleading an insufficient defense or any redundant, immaterial, impertinent, or scandalous material." Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f). The Court has discretion in deciding a motion to strike. See Cambridge Toxicology Grp., Inc. v. Exnicios, 495 F.3d 169, 178 (5th Cir. 2007). The Court agrees that Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to Counts I and II. However, the Court does not agree that this justifies striking Paragraphs 68 through 73 of the Complaint. These paragraphs allege only Counts I and II which have been dismissed; therefore, it is unnecessary to strike these specific allegations. The Court DENIES the Motion as moot. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/2/2022) (chmb)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 6/5/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2022. Discovery due by 1/6/2023. Motions due by 2/6/2023. Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2023. Pretrial Materials due by 5/15/2023. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/28/2022) (chmb)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters **26(f) Report** by Match Group Inc. Related document: #89 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal. (Zambrano, Angela)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Match Group Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Zambrano, Angela)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION to Strike filed by Match Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: It is ORDERED that the settlement conference is SET for Wednesday, 5/11/2022 09:30 AM C.D.T. via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. It is further ORDERED that by no later than 5:00 p.m. C.D.T. on 5/9/2022, each party shall submit a completed Confidential Settlement Conference Information Sheet, a copy of which is attached to this Order as Exhibit B, to chambers via email at ray_orders@txnd.uscourts.gov. This document shall not be filed with the clerk, but shall be submitted only to the chambers of the undersigned. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 4/12/2022) (ykp)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: The Court hereby sets a Status Conference, via telephone, on Tuesday, 4/12/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. C.D.T. The dial-in number is: (877) 873-8017. The Clerk will email the code to access the conference to counsel of record for the parties. If any other party wishes to participate in the telephonic hearing, the party shall file an appropriate request with the clerk or place a telephone call to Ms. Elsherie Moore, courtroom deputy clerk, at (817) 850-6664. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 4/8/2022) (ykp)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr for for a Settlement Conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/8/2022) (chmb)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Designation of Mediator by Match Group Inc. (Zambrano, Angela)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s #91 Unoopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant must file its responsive pleading on or before April 13, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/7/2022) (chmb)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Match Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to Reopen this Case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2022) (chmb)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2022) (chmb)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ELECTRONIC ORDER: No later than 14 days from the date of this order, the parties shall submit a Joint Designation of Mediator in which the parties either name an agreed mediator or state that the parties cannot agree to a mediator. The parties are ordered to complete mediation no later than May 31, 2022, and file a Mediation Report describing the status of settlement negotiations no later than June 7, 2022. The parties' obligation to file a Mediation Report is separate from any reporting requirements of the mediator. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2022) (chmb)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #74 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority and #83 Motion to Lift Stay as MOOT. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2022) (chmb)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Before the Court are: (1) Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss ("Motion to Dismiss") (Doc. No. 20); (2) Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Exclude Matters Outside the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(d) ("Motion to Exclude") (Doc. No. 26); and (3) Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply ("Motion for Leave") (Doc. No. 32). The Court has carefully considered each of the motions, the responses, the replies, the supporting appendices, the applicable law, and the relevant portions of the record. The Court grants Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss as to the claim for equitable monetary relief in Counts I-IV. The Court also grants Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II because Match is entitled to immunity under 47 U.S.C. 230 of the Communications Decency Act, thus those claims are barred and dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Match Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss is denied in all other respects. The Court denies Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Exclude. The Court also denies Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply.The Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/24/2022) (chmb)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #83 MOTION to Lift Stay re 54 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure,,,, 43 Order Staying Case, (Tepfer, Reid)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE filed by Match Group Inc re: #83 MOTION to Lift Stay re 54 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure,,,, 43 Order Staying Case, (Zambrano, Angela)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Lift Stay re 54 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure 43 Order Staying Case filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tepfer, Reid)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Federal Trade Commission re #27 Response/Objection (Brief Clarifying the Equitable Relief Sought as to Counts I and II of the Complaint) (Tepfer, Reid)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #78 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Zuckerman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/22/2021) (chmb)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 (Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Info - Zuckerman (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Zuckerman, Sarah)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Zuckerman on behalf of Federal Trade Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Zuckerman, Sarah)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sarah Zuckerman added to party Federal Trade Commission(pty:pla) (Zuckerman, Sarah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2021: #2 Additional Page(s) Complete PHV App) (chmb).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: The Court ORDERS the FTC to file a brief of no more than five (5) pages clarifying the "equitable relief" it seeks for Counts I and II as set forth in the Complaint, and addressing whether AMG Cap. Mgmt., LLC v. Fed. Trade Comm'n, U.S., 141 S. Ct. 1341 (2021) impacts that relief. The brief is due on or before December 30, 2021. There shall be no response from Match Group, Inc. unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/16/2021) (chmb)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #74 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (Tepfer, Reid)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE filed by Match Group Inc re: #74 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Tepfer, Reid)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint STATUS REPORT Concerning ADR filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Tepfer, Reid)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: The Court orders the parties to advise the Court in a joint filing as to their opinions on alternative dispute resolution, particularly in light of AMG Capital Mgmt., LLC v. FTC, U.S., 141 S.Ct. 1341 (2021). This joint filing must be accomplished by July 16, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/6/2021) (chmb)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Match Group Inc. (mjr)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #69 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/1/2021) (chmb)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Match Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission. (oyh)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #66 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/21/2021) (chmb)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Tepfer, Reid)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Match Group Inc. (oyh)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/9/2021) (chmb)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Match Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Match Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Zambrano, Angela)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #60 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Attorney Zachary Alexander Keller withdrawn as attorney of record for Plaintiff FTC. Reid A. Tepfer shall remain as attorney of record for Plaintiff FTC. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/2/2021) (chmb)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order RE Withdrawal of Attorney) (Keller, Zachary)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Tepfer, Reid)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order - Defendant Match Group, Inc. filed a Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Doc. No. 56) on May 17, 2021. At this time, the case remains stayed as the Court awaits the parties' Joint Report. See Order (Doc. No. 54) ("The parties shall file a Joint Report within 45 days of the United States Supreme Court issuing a decision in the TC v. Credit Bureau case."). Moreover, Defendant did not seek leave of the Court to file its Notice of Supplemental Authorities as required by the Court's Local Civil Rules. See LR 56.7. For these reasons, the Court strikes the Notice of Supplemental Authorities. Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Objection to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities is overruled as moot. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/25/2021) (chmb)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OBJECTION filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #56 Supplemental Document (Aijaz, M)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Supplemental Document by Match Group Inc as to #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Zambrano, Angela)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reid Abram Tepfer on behalf of Federal Trade Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Tepfer, Reid)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE AND STAYING CASE - Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Supreme Court Decision in FTC v. Credit Bureau, filed on September 8, 2020. After considering the motion, response and reply the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be, and hereby is, GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records.Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. The parties shall file a Joint Report within 45 days of the United States Supreme Court issuing a decision in the FTC v. Credit Bureau case. The Joint Report shall contain statements of how the parties wish to proceed. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/9/2020) (chmb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY filed by Match Group Inc re: #51 MOTION to Stay Pending Supreme Court Decision in FTC V. Credit Bureau (Zambrano, Angela)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #51 MOTION to Stay Pending Supreme Court Decision in FTC V. Credit Bureau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix to Opposition) (Keller, Zachary)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Stay Pending Supreme Court Decision in FTC V. Credit Bureau filed by Match Group Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Recently Decided Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (oyh)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Recently Decided Authority. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/1/2020) (chmb)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Recently Decided Authority and For Stay of all Proceedings Pending Supreme Court Decision in FTC v. Credit Bureau. Any motion to stay shall be filed within 7 days from the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/31/2020) (chmb)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #46 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recently Decided Authority and For Stay of all Proceedings Pending Supreme Court Decision in FTC v. Credit Bureau (Keller, Zachary)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recently Decided Authority and For Stay of all Proceedings Pending Supreme Court Decision in FTC v. Credit Bureau filed by Match Group Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE filed by Match Group Inc re: #44 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recently Decided Authority (Zambrano, Angela)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recently Decided Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Recently Decided Authority, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Notice of Recently Decided Authority, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Keller, Zachary)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ELECTRONIC ORDER STAYING CASE - Before the Court is Match Group Inc.s 'Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 20). Due to the current issues affecting the entire country, the Court STAYS this case pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. Furthermore, the Parties must seek leave of the Court before submitting any additional or supplemental filings related to the Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/22/2020) (chmb)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY filed by Match Group Inc re: #40 Response/Objection (Zambrano, Angela)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #40 Response/Objection (Keller, Zachary)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OBJECTION filed by Match Group Inc re: #37 Notice (Other), #38 Notice (Other), #39 Notice (Other) (Zambrano, Angela)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Recently Decided Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Notice of Recently Decided Authority) (Keller, Zachary)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Recently Decided Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Notice of Recently Decided Authority) (Keller, Zachary)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Recently Decided Authority filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Notice of Recently Decided Authority) (Keller, Zachary)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Keller, Zachary)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE filed by Match Group Inc re: #32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Zambrano, Angela)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #26 MOTION Exclude Matters Outside Pleadings re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Keller, Zachary)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADINES re: #32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 12/11/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/26/2019) (chmb)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sur-Reply, #2 Proposed Order Order Admitting Sur-Reply) (Keller, Zachary)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by Match Group Inc re: #26 MOTION Exclude Matters Outside Pleadings re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Zambrano, Angela)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY filed by Match Group Inc re: #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Zambrano, Angela)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Unopposed Motion for Five Page Extension of Reply Brief. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/14/2019) (chmb)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Five page extension to Reply brief filed by Match Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix to Opposition) (Keller, Zachary)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION Exclude Matters Outside Pleadings re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Federal Trade Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Excluding Matters Outside the Pleadings) (Keller, Zachary)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #24 Motion for Approval to File Brief in Excess of Twenty-Five pages. Plaintiff shall is allowed to file responsive brief that exceeds the page limit by 10 pages. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/30/2019) (chmb)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION Approval to File Brief in Excess of Page Limit filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Exceed Page Limit) (Keller, Zachary)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anna Tutundjian. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/21/2019) (chmb)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chad S Hummel. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/21/2019) (chmb)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Match Group Inc re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Zambrano, Angela)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Match Group Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Document Restricted) Defendant Match Group Inc's Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Match Group Inc (Zambrano, Angela)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion Approval to File Brief in Excess of Page of 25 pages. Defendant shall be allowed to exceed the page limitation by five pages. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/16/2019) (chmb)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10342334) filed by Match Group Inc Attorney Anna Tutundjian added to party Match Group Inc(pty:dft) (Tutundjian, Anna)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10342277) filed by Match Group Inc Attorney Chad S Hummel added to party Match Group Inc(pty:dft) (Hummel, Chad)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Y Sillers on behalf of Match Group Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sillers, David)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Approval to File Brief in Excess of Page Limit filed by Match Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Match Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate InterActiveCorp for Match Group Inc. (Zambrano, Angela)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Angela C Zambrano on behalf of Match Group Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Zambrano, Angela)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Wilshire. After further review, there was no fee paid, so there is no admission fee to return to the Applicant. Matthew Wilshire is now admitted to the NDTX. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/9/2019) (chmb) Modified on 10/24/2019 (chmb).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Hasan Aijaz. After further review, there was no fee paid, so there is no admission fee to return to the Applicant. M. Hasan Aijaz is now admitted to the NDTX. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/9/2019) (chmb) Modified on 10/24/2019 (chmb).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Aijaz, M)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Hasan Aijaz on behalf of Federal Trade Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Aijaz, M)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Match Group Inc, served on 9/26/2019. (Keller, Zachary) Modified event on 9/27/2019 (mla).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Match Group Inc. (sre)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew James Wilshire added to party Federal Trade Commission(pty:pla) (Wilshire, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney M. Hasan Aijaz (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Aijaz PHV Proposed Order) (Keller, Zachary)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission. (Keller, Zachary)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Match Group, Inc. filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Keller, Zachary)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Match Group, Inc. filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Keller, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Match Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match Group Inc
Represented By: David Y Sillers
Represented By: Chad S Hummel
Represented By: Anna Tutundjian
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Represented By: Benjamin M Mundel
Represented By: Chelsea Ann Priest
Represented By: Tayler G Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match Group LLC
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Represented By: Benjamin M Mundel
Represented By: Chad S Hummel
Represented By: Chelsea Ann Priest
Represented By: Tayler G Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match.com LLC
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Represented By: Benjamin M Mundel
Represented By: Chad S Hummel
Represented By: Chelsea Ann Priest
Represented By: Tayler G Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Matthew James Wilshire
Represented By: M Hasan Aijaz
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Keller
Represented By: Reid Abram Tepfer
Represented By: Erica Rollins Hilliard
Represented By: John Reeve O'Gorman
Represented By: Sarah Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?