Johnson v. Davis
Petitioner: Matthew Johnson
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Interested Party: Jeremy Schepers
Case Number: 3:2019cv02310
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/22/2019) (ndt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as Jeffrey Robert Newberry re: #6 CJA 30 - Order to Appoint or Pay Attorney in DP Case. (axm)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #8 ) was entered in error and is hereby VACATED and withdrawn. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/13/2019) (ctf)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***VACATED AND WITHDRAWN PER #9 ORDER*** ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. On or before thirty days from the date of this Order, Petitioner shall pay to the Clerk of this Court the five-dollar filing fee in this case. Petitioner's failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the dismissal without prejudice of this action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/12/2019) (aaa) Modified on 11/14/2019 (ctf).
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Matthew Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) declaration of indigence and statement of inmate trust account, #2 Proposed Order) (Newberry, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/14/2019 to reinstate gavel per #9 Order (ctf).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CJA 30 Order appointing attorney in a death penalty case. Attorney Jeffrey Robert Newberry, David R Dow for Matthew Johnson appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order - see Miscellaneous Order 3, Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the #CJA Attorney Information page or use the #directory to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/23/2019) (ykp)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 (Document Restricted) Sealed Advisory from the Federal Public Defender for the Northern District of Texas (Sealed pursuant to order dated 10/15/2019) filed by Jeremy Schepers (Schepers-FPD, Jeremy)
October 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue Oct 15 15:32:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: On or before seven days from the date of this Order, the FPD must file an advisory under seal. The clerk will transmit a copy of this Order and a copy of Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel to the Federal Public Defender for the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/15/2019) (aaa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tomee Morgan Heining on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Heining, Tomee)
September 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Fri Sep 27 17:15:44 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
September 27, 2019 Judge Ada Brown added. (axm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Matthew Johnson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michelle Elizabeth Ward added to party Matthew Johnson(pty:pet) (Ward, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin B Wolff
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Ward
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Newberry
Represented By: David R Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward L Marshall
Represented By: Tomee Morgan Heining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jeremy Schepers
Represented By: Jeremy Don Schepers-FPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?