Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Dhanmaan Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Manoj R. Bantawa Rai, Bipin Thakali, Abhisek Rai, Dhanmaan Corporation and Manoj R Bantawa Rai
Case Number: 3:2019cv02313
Filed: September 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Fri Nov 8 08:42:55 CST 2019 (crt)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER: This Order addresses Defendants' Bipin Thakali, Manoj R. Bantawa Rai, and Abhisek Rai (collectively, "Defendants") Motion to Extend Time to Answer [ECF No. #12 ] and amends the Court's November 5, 2019, Order [ECF No. #13 ]. The Court grants the Motion. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 12/5/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/7/2019) (ndt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Abhisek Rai ; served on 11/2/2019. (King, Jamie)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Dhanmaan Corporation answer due 12/5/2020; Abhisek Rai answer due 12/5/2020; Bipin Thakali answer due 12/5/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/6/2019) (axm)
November 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Wed Nov 6 13:12:56 CST 2019 (crt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Manoj R Bantawa Rai, Dhanmaan Corporation, Abhisek Rai, Bipin Thakali. (mla)
October 28, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon Oct 28 08:39:45 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Bipin Thakali answer or response due 11/29/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/24/2019) (chmb) Modified on 10/25/2019 (chmb).
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bipin Thakali. (rekc)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bipin Thakali ; served on 10/5/2019. (King, Jamie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Manoj R Bantawa Rai ; served on 10/5/2019. (King, Jamie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dhanmaan Corporation ; served on 10/5/2019. (King, Jamie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/1/2019) (rekc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Manoj R. Bantawa Rai, Dhanmaan Corporation, Abhisek Rai, Bipin Thakali. (sre)
September 28, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
September 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
September 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10299764) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Dhanmaan Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manoj R. Bantawa Rai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bipin Thakali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abhisek Rai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhanmaan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manoj R Bantawa Rai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?