United States v. $8,000.53 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 3329 et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: $8,000.53 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM JPMORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 3329, $193.17 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1189, $807.44 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2183, 2019 MERCEDES-BENZ GLS 550, $8,573.43 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2931, $8,815.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 6039, $9,999.94 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9588, $7,972.78 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 4284, All Funds in Northwestern Mutual PDIA Policy Ending in 6827, $9,899.99 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0100, $4,777.64 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 3778, $4,559.93 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9381, Real Property Located at 7222 Bella Bluff, San Antonio, Texas, $8,150.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5872, $76,321.63 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 7565, $23,944.99 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5957, $16,000.05 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 8725, $7,012.58 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0629, $9,172.20 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5270, $8,910.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 8965, $1,340.04 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5339, $1,349.52 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5821, $4,764.36 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9265, $88.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5813, $13,929.46 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 6933, $7,213.69 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0809, All Funds in Northwestern Mutual PDIA Policy Ending in 6851, $3,990.01 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 969, $9,110.01 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0550, $118,649.75 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0650, Real Property Located at 2102 Wright Street, Austin, Texas, $8,909.99 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2723, $21,677.88 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1390, Real Property Located at 36 Granadilla, Boerne, Texas and $24,511.93 in funds seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1251
Claimant: City of San Antonio Texas, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Northside ISD, Alamo Community College District, Bexar County Texas and University Health System
Case Number: 3:2019cv02402
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/17/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/26/2019) (mcrd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Verified Claim of Bexar County, Texas et al. filed by Alamo Community College District, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Bexar County, Texas, City of San Antonio, Texas, Northside I.S.D., University Health System (Bird, Douglas)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Alamo Community College District, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Bexar County Texas, City of San Antonio Texas, Northside ISD, University Health System. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Alamo Community College District (pty:clm), party Bexar County Road and Flood District (pty:clm), party Bexar County Texas (pty:clm), party City of San Antonio Texas (pty:clm), party Northside ISD (pty:clm), party University Health System (pty:clm). (Bird, Douglas)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bexar County, Texas, City of San Antonio, Texas, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Alamo Community College District, Northside I.S.D., University Health System. (Bird, Douglas)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for pretrial management. All nondispositive motions, pending or prospective, are referred to the magistrate judge for determination. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/20/2019) (aaa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Publication filed by United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Verified Claim by $1,349.52 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5821, $118,649.75 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0650, $13,929.46 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 6933, $16,000.05 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 8725, $21,677.88 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1390, $23,944.99 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5957, $24,511.93 in funds seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1251, $3,990.01 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 969, $4,764.36 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9265, $4,777.64 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 3778, $7,213.69 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0809, $7,972.78 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 4284, $76,321.63 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 7565, $8,573.43 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2931, $807.44 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2183, $88.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5813, $9,172.20 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5270, $9,999.94 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9588, 2019 MERCEDES-BENZ GLS 550, All Funds in Northwestern Mutual PDIA Policy Ending in 6827, All Funds in Northwestern Mutual PDIA Policy Ending in 6851, Real Property Located at 2102 Wright Street, Austin, Texas, Real Property Located at 36 Granadilla, Boerne, Texas, Real Property Located at 7222 Bella Bluff, San Antonio, Texas. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Publication filed by United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Advertisement Certification Report) (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Court Request for Recusal: The referral judge for this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan is no longer assigned to the case. (cea)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest of Property in Rem filed by United States. (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States. (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint filed by United States (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Meacham-DOJ, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. $8,000.53 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 3329 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,000.53 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM JPMORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 3329
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $193.17 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1189
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $807.44 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2183
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2019 MERCEDES-BENZ GLS 550
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,573.43 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2931
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,815.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 6039
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,999.94 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9588
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,972.78 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 4284
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds in Northwestern Mutual PDIA Policy Ending in 6827
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,899.99 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,777.64 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 3778
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,559.93 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9381
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 7222 Bella Bluff, San Antonio, Texas
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,150.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5872
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $76,321.63 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 7565
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $23,944.99 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5957
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,000.05 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 8725
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,012.58 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0629
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,172.20 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5270
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,910.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 8965
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,340.04 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5339
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,349.52 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5821
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,764.36 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 9265
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $88.00 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 5813
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,929.46 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 6933
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,213.69 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0809
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds in Northwestern Mutual PDIA Policy Ending in 6851
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,990.01 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 969
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,110.01 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0550
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $118,649.75 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 0650
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 2102 Wright Street, Austin, Texas
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,909.99 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 2723
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $21,677.88 in Funds Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1390
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 36 Granadilla, Boerne, Texas
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,511.93 in funds seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending in 1251
Represented By: Scott Cashion Thomas
Represented By: Grant Kojis Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Chad E Meacham-DOJ
Represented By: Andrew O Wirmani-DOJ
Represented By: Dimitri Narciso Rocha-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of San Antonio Texas
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County Road and Flood District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Northside ISD
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alamo Community College District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County Texas
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: University Health System
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?