Sivils et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bob R. Sivils, Linda Ludden Sivils and Bob R Sivils
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Steve Tillman, Chelsea Gordon, Mike L. Trumbull and Mike L Trumbull
Case Number: 3:2019cv02496
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/13/2020. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/15/2019) (mla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant' Motion to Preclude Attorney's Fees Under Section 542A.007 filed by Chelsea Gordon, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Steve Tillman, Mike L Trumbull. (Puckett, Alissa)
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Chelsea Gordon, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Steve Tillman, Mike L Trumbull. (Puckett, Alissa)
October 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bob R Sivils, Linda Ludden Sivils. (Randle, Janet)
October 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janet R Randle for Janet R Randle, David J Welch, Jeremy (Beau) Powell on behalf of Bob R Sivils, Linda Ludden Sivils. (Randle, Janet)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Chelsea Gordon, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Steve Tillman, Mike L. Trumbull re #3 MOTION to Preclude Attorney's Fees Under Section 542A.007 (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support) (Lewis, Wm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 ***WITHDRAWN PER #9 NOTICE*** MOTION to Preclude Attorney's Fees Under Section 542A.007 filed by Chelsea Gordon, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Steve Tillman, Mike L. Trumbull Attorney Wm Lance Lewis added to party Chelsea Gordon(pty:dft), Attorney Wm Lance Lewis added to party Steve Tillman(pty:dft), Attorney Wm Lance Lewis added to party Mike L. Trumbull(pty:dft) (Lewis, Wm) Modified on 11/14/2019 (mla).
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Puckett, Alissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 439th District of Rockwall County, TX, case number 1-19-1325 filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10354936) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Lewis, Wm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivils et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Alissa Puckett
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Tillman
Represented By: Alissa Puckett
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Gordon
Represented By: Alissa Puckett
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike L. Trumbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike L Trumbull
Represented By: Alissa Puckett
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob R. Sivils
Represented By: Evan L Van Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ludden Sivils
Represented By: Evan L Van Shaw
Represented By: David Welch
Represented By: Jeremy Beau Powell
Represented By: Janet R Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob R Sivils
Represented By: Evan L Van Shaw
Represented By: David Welch
Represented By: Jeremy Beau Powell
Represented By: Janet R Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?