Snitkin v. PennyMac Loan Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Snitkin
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services LLC, Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Equifax Information Services LLC and Texas Dow Employees Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv02511
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nayeem Nur Mohammed on behalf of Mary Elizabeth Snitkin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mohammed, Nayeem)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Plaintiff Mary Elizabeth Snitkin ("Plaintiff") has announced that this case has been resolved as to Defendant Texas Dow Employees Credit Union ("Defendant"). See ECF No. #24 . By 12/31/2019, Plaintiff and Defendant are to file the appropriate dismissal documents in this case. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/16/2019) (twd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Texas Dow Employees Credit Union filed by Mary Elizabeth Snitkin (Hijazin, Majdi)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Plaintiff Mary Elizabeth Snitkin ("Plaintiff') has announced that this case has been resolved as to Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. ("Defendant"). See ECF No. #22 . By 12/31/2019, Plaintiff and Defendant are to file the appropriate dismissal documents in this case. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/9/2019) (twd)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of of Settlement as to Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. filed by Mary Elizabeth Snitkin (Hijazin, Majdi)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas G Yoxall on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Yoxall, Thomas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Dow Employees Credit Union re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Leyh, Steven)
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Texas Dow Employees Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leyh, Steven)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Dow Employees Credit Union. (Leyh, Steven)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Texas Dow Employees Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leyh, Steven) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (rekc).
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven A. Leyh on behalf of Texas Dow Employees Credit Union. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Leyh, Steven)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PennyMac Loan Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC for PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Hansen, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by PennyMac Loan Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Matthew K Hansen added to party PennyMac Loan Services LLC(pty:dft) (Hansen, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laurie N Patton on behalf of Mary Elizabeth Snitkin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Patton, Laurie)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Electronic Order: Unless exempted, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in or maintain their principal office in this district. To date, one or more of the parties has failed to comply with Local Rule 83.10 or file a motion for leave to appear without local counsel. The parties have twenty days from this date to comply if they have not already done so. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/21/2019) (chmb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to PennyMac Loan Services LLC ; served on 11/5/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Capital One Bank (USA) NA ; served on 11/6/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Texas Dow Employees Credit Union ; served on 11/5/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC. Waiver sent on 10/25/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Equifax Information Services LLC, PennyMac Loan Services LLC, Texas Dow Employees Credit Union. (ndt)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Majdi Hijazin on behalf of Mary Elizabeth Snitkin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hijazin, Majdi)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Majdi Hijazin on behalf of Mary Elizabeth Snitkin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hijazin, Majdi)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Elizabeth Snitkin. (Hijazin, Majdi)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Equifax Information Services LLC, PennyMac Loan Services LLC, Texas Dow Employees Credit Union filed by Mary Elizabeth Snitkin. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10357742) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Hijazin, Majdi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snitkin v. PennyMac Loan Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas G Yoxall
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Dow Employees Credit Union
Represented By: Steven A. Leyh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Snitkin
Represented By: Majdi Hijazin
Represented By: Laurie N Patton
Represented By: Nayeem Nur Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?