Starrett v. U.S. Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: William Henry Starrett, Jr
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Army Special Operations Command, National Technology & Engineering Solutions of Sandia LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, U.S. Army, Defense Advanced Research Projects Agency, National Nuclear Security Administration, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Army Reserve Command, U.S. Special Operations Command, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Army Civil Affairs & Psychological Operations Command, Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC and Texas Military Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv02579
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that the above-styled and -numbered civil action be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/26/2019) (mla)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Adopting #7 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/26/2019) (mla)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Findings and Recommendations with Appendix in Support by William Henry Starrett, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Starrett, William)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should sua sponte DISMISS Plaintiff's #3 Complaint with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and on res judicata grounds. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/18/2019) (twd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Defense Advanced Research Projects Agency, Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, National Nuclear Security Administration, National Technology & Engineering Solutions of Sandia LLC, Texas Military Department, U.S. Army, U.S. Army Civil Affairs & Psychological Operations Command, U.S. Army Reserve Command, U.S. Army Special Operations Command, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Special Operations Command, U.S. Attorney. (cdt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by William Henry Starrett, Jr. (cdt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case filed by William Henry Starrett, Jr. (cdt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Defense Advanced Research Projects Agency, Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, National Nuclear Security Administration, National Technology & Engineering Solutions of Sandia LLC, Texas Military Department, U.S. Army, U.S. Army Civil Affairs & Psychological Operations Command, U.S. Army Reserve Command, U.S. Army Special Operations Command, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Special Operations Command filed by William Henry Starrett, Jr. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number 119893) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starrett v. U.S. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Special Operations Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Technology & Engineering Solutions of Sandia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Advanced Research Projects Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Nuclear Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Reserve Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Special Operations Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Civil Affairs & Psychological Operations Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Military Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Henry Starrett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?