Stevens Transport, Inc. v. Stautihar et al
Plaintiff: Stevens Transport, Inc. and Stevens Transport Inc
Defendant: Espinoza Law Firm, PLLC, Joseph Stautihar, Law Offices of Walters, Balido & Crain, L.L.P., Exel, Inc., Law Offices of Walters Balido & Crain LLP, Exel Inc and Espinoza Law Firm PLLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02590
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY filed by Espinoza Law Firm PLLC, Joseph Stautihar re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Proposed Order) (Brock, Lara)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Espinoza Law Firm PLLC, Joseph Stautihar (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Proposed Order) (Brock, Lara)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Stevens Transport Inc. (Sargent, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Stevens Transport Inc re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Sargent, David)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/2/2019) (mla)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Exel Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gregory Richardson Ave added to party Exel Inc (pty:dft). (Ave, Gregory)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Law Offices of Walters Balido & Crain LLP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gregory Richardson Ave added to party Law Offices of Walters Balido & Crain LLP (pty:dft). (Ave, Gregory)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Espinoza Law Firm PLLC, Joseph Stautihar (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Proposed Order)Attorney Lara Brock added to party Espinoza Law Firm PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lara Brock added to party Joseph Stautihar(pty:dft) (Brock, Lara)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Espinoza Law Firm PLLC; served on 11/11/2019. (axm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joseph Stautihar; served on 11/6/2019. (axm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's First) against All Defendants filed by Stevens Transport Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summary Plan Description) (Sargent, David)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Exel Inc, served on 11/5/2019; Law Offices of Walters Balido & Crain LLP, served on 11/5/2019. (axm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Espinoza Law Firm PLLC, Exel Inc, Law Offices of Walters Balido & Crain LLP, Joseph Stautihar. (ykp)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stevens Transport, Inc.. (Sargent, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Stevens Transport, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10376585) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sargent, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens Transport, Inc. v. Stautihar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espinoza Law Firm, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stautihar
Represented By: Lara Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Walters, Balido & Crain, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Walters Balido & Crain LLP
Represented By: Gregory Richardson Ave
Represented By: Jay R Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exel Inc
Represented By: Gregory Richardson Ave
Represented By: Jay R Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espinoza Law Firm PLLC
Represented By: Lara Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevens Transport, Inc.
Represented By: David L Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevens Transport Inc
Represented By: Steven W Hopkins
Represented By: David L Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?