Roe v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: John Roe
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K McAleenan, Marc Moore, US Immigration & Customs Enforcement and William Barr
Case Number: 3:2019cv02595
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, Marc Moore, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On 11/1/2019, the pro se plaintiff filed a complaint against the defendants and paid the filing fee. Because he paid the fee, the plaintiff is now responsible for serving each defendant with a summons and a copy of the complaint in this case as provided by Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If the plaintiff does not file a valid return of service or otherwise show that the defendant was properly served, this action may be dismissed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/5/2019) (Attachments: #1 Rule 4 FRCvP Summons) #2 Summons . (ykp) Modified documents and text on 11/6/2019 (ykp).
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS filed by John Roe. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued, #2 Summons to be Issued, #3 Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons to be Issued) (Roe, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Roe. (cdt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (cdt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan, Marc Moore, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration & Customs Enforcement filed by John Roe. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number 119959) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?