Yebra Aranda v. Macarty Escalante
Plaintiff: Ms. Elsa Maria Yebra Aranda
Defendant: Edgar Arturo Macarty Escalante
Case Number: 3:2019cv02618
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 22:9001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/5/2019) (aaa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued, #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed on 11/5/2019. (aaa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elsa Maria Yebra Aranda. (axm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Seal Complaint and Other Documents Containing Sensitive Information filed by Elsa Maria Yebra Aranda. (axm)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Document Restricted) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: The Court finds it is necessary to enter this Temporary Restraining Order ex parte to prevent irreparable injury. A copy of this Order and a copy of Petitioner's Verified Complaint and Petition for Return of Child, together with all attachments and all other filings, shall be served upon Respondent on or before the 12th day of November 2019 by the United States Marshal at Respondent's address. Respondent shall appear before this Court on 11/15/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 1306 of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, located at 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/5/2019) (aaa) Modified on 11/8/2019 (aaa).
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ada Brown for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-2618-E. (ykp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Edgar Arturo Macarty Escalante. (ykp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 (Document Restricted) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Scheduling of An Expedited Hearing filed by Elsa Maria Yebra Aranda with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Abdul-Jabbar, Mustafa) Modified on 11/8/2019 (aaa).
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 (Document Restricted) COMPLAINT against Edgar Arturo Macarty Escalante filed by Elsa Maria Yebra Aranda. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10383063) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Abdul-Jabbar, Mustafa) Modified on 11/8/2019 (aaa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yebra Aranda v. Macarty Escalante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Elsa Maria Yebra Aranda
Represented By: Matthew R Stammel
Represented By: Mustafa Abdul-Jabbar
Represented By: Melissa Lynne James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Arturo Macarty Escalante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?