Phillips v. HCA Healthtrust
Plaintiff: Linda Phillips
Defendant: HCA Healthtrust
Case Number: 3:2019cv02642
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Dec 17 15:03:02 CST 2019 (crt)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Adopting Findings, Conclusions and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. If she fails to do so, or files an amended complaint that fails to state a claim on which relief can be granted, this action will be dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/17/2019) (ykp)
November 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Fri Nov 8 10:06:00 CST 2019 (crt)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice to Plaintiff Linda Phillips's right to file, within a reasonable time to be set by the Court, an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies in the findings, conclusions, and recommendation. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/8/2019) (aaa)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/8/2019) (aaa)
November 7, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Nov 7 14:14:23 CST 2019 (crt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linda Phillips. (cdt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Linda Phillips. (cdt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against HCA Healthtrust filed by Linda Phillips. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. HCA Healthtrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Healthtrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?