Tolliver v. Covington Credit et al
Plaintiff: Birdell Tolliver
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc and Covington Credit
Case Number: 3:2019cv02655
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary S Kessler for Gary S. Kessler and Stephen J. Huschka on behalf of Covington Credit. (Kessler, Gary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covington Credit. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Covington Credit. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Joshua Howard Threadcraft added to party Covington Credit(pty:dft) (Threadcraft, Joshua)
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc (Russell, Molly)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Initial Core Disclosures filed by Birdell Tolliver (Bellinder, Thomas)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for jury trial on this Court's three-week docket beginning 1/18/2021 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2020. Motions due by 9/1/2020. Discovery due by 9/1/2020. Settlement Status Report due by 3/6/2020. Pretrial Order due by 12/28/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 12/28/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2021 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 12/17/2019) (ndt)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order - Joint Report with Counsel for Experian by Birdell Tolliver. (Bellinder, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Covington Credit, served on 11/12/2019. (Bellinder, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 12/17/2019. Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 12/3/2019) (twd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Russell, Molly)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Molly J. Russell added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Russell, Molly)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions Inc ; served on 11/11/2019. (Bellinder, Thomas)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/12/2019) (aaa)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Birdell Tolliver (Bellinder, Thomas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Birdell Tolliver. (Bellinder, Thomas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Covington Credit, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (aaa)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons (2) filed by Birdell Tolliver. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) - Second Summons) (Bellinder, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Birdell Tolliver. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10391601) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - POP, #2 Exhibit(s) - Oct CR, #3 Exhibit(s) - Dispute, #4 Exhibit(s) - Sept CR, #5 Cover Sheet - CCS) (Bellinder, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolliver v. Covington Credit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Molly J Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Credit
Represented By: Joshua Howard Threadcraft
Represented By: Gary S Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birdell Tolliver
Represented By: Thomas Jon-William Bellinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?