Kelly v. Quicken Loans Inc
Plaintiff: Christina M Kelly
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02668
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Written designation of local counsel must be filed within 14 days of this Order (LR 83.10(a)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/3/2020) (chmb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quicken Loans Inc. (Smith, Karen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Quicken Loans Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Karen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Quicken Loans Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Karen)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is the Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond (Doc. 8). The Court construes this as an unopposed motion, and the Court hereby GRANTS #8 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond. Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before January 2, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/13/2019) (chmb)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by Quicken Loans Inc. (Smith, Karen)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Without Designation of Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/15/2019) (chmb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File TO APPEAR WITHOUT DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL filed by Christina M Kelly (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Manchee, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans Inc. (sre)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Suit filed by CHRISTINA M. KELLY. (Manchee, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CHRISTINA M. KELLY. (Manchee, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against QUICKEN LOANS, INC. filed by CHRISTINA M. KELLY. (filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10394671) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-R) (Manchee, James) Modified docket text to update payment information on 11/8/2019 (sre).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Quicken Loans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Represented By: Karen D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M Kelly
Represented By: James Justin Manchee
Represented By: Marilyn S Altamira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?