Weisner v. Criminal Court of Appeals
Plaintiff: Sean Weisner
Defendant: Criminal Court of Appeals
Case Number: 3:2019cv02692
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Dec 5 16:12:56 CST 2019 (crt)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/5/2019) (chmb)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Sean Weisner. (axm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Public correspondence filed, deputy clerk response attached, received from Sean Weisner. re: #3 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (sre)
November 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. remailed to TDCJ Jester III Unit, 3 Jester Road, Richmond, TX 77406 Fri Nov 15 16:06:04 CST 2019 (crt)
November 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Nov 15 15:54:36 CST 2019 (crt)
November 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Nov 15 09:31:31 CST 2019 (crt)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Petitioner Sean Weisner must address the following deficiency: Petitioner did not pay the required filing fee or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis. Therefore, Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certificate of inmate trust account, by December 13, 2019. See In re Stone, 118 F.3d 1032, 1034 (5th Cir. 1997) (finding petition for writ of mandamus that arose out of application for postconviction relief was not subject to fee payment requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)). PETITIONER'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b). The form necessary to comply with this order is available in the law library of the prison unit in which Plaintiff is confined. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/14/2019) (chmb)
November 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Nov 12 15:40:23 CST 2019 (crt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Petition For Writ of Mandamus filed by Sean Weisner. (cdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #1 Envelope) (axm).
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisner v. Criminal Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Weisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criminal Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?