Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC)
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M Azar, II
Intervenor Plaintiff: Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Baylor Health Care System and Texas Health Resources
Case Number: 3:2019cv02857
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Charles Abbuhl on behalf of Alex M Azar, II, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Abbuhl, Joshua)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Health and Human Services; served on 12/26/2019. (Holsinger, Kara)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alex M Azar, II; served on 12/26/2019. (Holsinger, Kara)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carol A. Poindexter. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/20/2019) (chmb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #10 Appendix in Support by Intervenor Plaintiffs Baylor Health Care System, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Texas Health Resources. (Haass, Shea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Carol Poindexter (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10489839) filed by Baylor Health Care System, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Texas Health Resources (Haass, Shea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Health Resources. (Haass, Shea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Methodist Hospitals of Dallas. (Haass, Shea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baylor Health Care System identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Baylor Scott and White Holdings for Baylor Health Care System. (Haass, Shea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by Baylor Health Care System, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Texas Health Resources re #8 MOTION to Intervene (Haass, Shea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Baylor Health Care System, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Texas Health Resources re #8 MOTION to Intervene (Haass, Shea)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Baylor Health Care System, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Texas Health Resources (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Baylor Health Care System, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Texas Health Resources added.Attorney Shea R Haass added to party Baylor Health Care System(pty:intvp), Attorney Shea R Haass added to party Methodist Hospitals of Dallas(pty:intvp), Attorney Shea R Haass added to party Texas Health Resources(pty:intvp) (Haass, Shea)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Brantley Starr recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ada Brown for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-2857-E. (ctf)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Alex M Azar, II, United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ndt)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Karen Gren Scholer recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Brantley Starr for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-2857-X. (ctf)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC). Amendment to #1 Complaint. (Holsinger, Kara) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ndt).
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Case Cover Sheet by Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC). Amendment to #1 Complaint. (Holsinger, Kara) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ndt).
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC). (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10448169) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Decision No. 2886, #2 Exhibit(s) Ruling on Request for Reconsideration of Decision No. 2886) (Holsinger, Kara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Joshua Charles Abbuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Joshua Charles Abbuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC)
Represented By: Kara Denise Holsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Methodist Hospitals of Dallas
Represented By: Shea R Haass
Represented By: Carol Ann Poindexter
Represented By: Marc B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Baylor Health Care System
Represented By: Shea R Haass
Represented By: Carol Ann Poindexter
Represented By: Marc B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Texas Health Resources
Represented By: Shea R Haass
Represented By: Carol Ann Poindexter
Represented By: Marc B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?