Garcia v. Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Plaintiff: Teresita Garcia
Defendant: Axxess Technology Solutions, Inc. and Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02948
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #15 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (ykp)
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 Final STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (Unopposed) by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Groves, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court denies #13 Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference due to absence of extraordinary circumstances. See Judge Specific Requirements III(B)(1), http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judge/district-judge-karen-gren-scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/26/2020) (chmb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File To Appear Telephonicallyat Scheduling Conference filed by Teresita Garcia (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Telephonically) (Gentile, Angelica)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Unless exempted, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in or maintain their principal office in this district. To date, one or more of the parties has failed to comply with Local Rule 83.10 or file a motion for leave to appear without local counsel. The parties have twenty days from this date to comply if they have not already done so. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/20/2020) (chmb)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are directed to confer and be prepared to discuss with the Court the matters set forth in Rules 16(b)(3) and 26(f). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court hereby sets this case for a scheduling conference hearing on 2/27/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Lead counsel and/or local counsel for each party, and all unrepresented parties, shall be present. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/3/2020) (ykp)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Groves, Charles)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. (Groves, Charles)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Groves, Charles)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Axxess Technology Solutions Inc answer due 1/31/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/3/2020) (axm)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) filed by Axxess Technology Solutions Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)Attorney Charles Christopher Groves added to party Axxess Technology Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Groves, Charles)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Axxess Technology Solutions Inc; served on 12/18/2019. (Gentile, Angelica)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Axxess Technology Solutions Inc. (aaa)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Manual Filing of Proposed Summons to be Issued by Clerk by Teresita Garcia re #1 Complaint. (Gentile, Angelica)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Axxess Technology Solutions, Inc. filed by Teresita Garcia. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10479057) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gentile, Angelica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axxess Technology Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axxess Technology Solutions Inc
Represented By: Charles Christopher Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Garcia
Represented By: Angelica Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?