Trinkhaus v. Photo Booth International LLC
Plaintiff: Nico Trinkhaus
Defendant: Photo Booth International LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03063
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Coles on behalf of Nico Trinkhaus. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Coles, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty-one days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/3/2020) (axm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nico Trinkhaus. (Liebowitz, Richard)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On December 27, 2019, plaintiff filed a complaint in this case but did not provide the clerk with a certificate of interested persons. No later than 20 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in thiscase. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/2/2020) (ndt)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Photo Booth International. (cdt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/30/2019) (cdt).
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (cdt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Nico Trinkhaus. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Photo Booth International LLC filed by Nico Trinkhaus. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10506450) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinkhaus v. Photo Booth International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nico Trinkhaus
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Represented By: Michael E Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Photo Booth International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?