Crouse v. Texas State Senate
Plaintiff: Charity Colleen Crouse
Defendant: Texas State Senate
Case Number: 3:2020cv00114
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 Public correspondence addressed to judge, received from Charity Colleen Crouse. (hml)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying the pro se plaintiff's #13 Requests for Motions to Transfer, for Leave to File for New Trial, For Consolidation of Cases and for Confirmation. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/27/2020) (mcrd)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Civil filed by Charity Colleen Crouse with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Crouse, Charity)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Before the Court is the pro se plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, filed 2/13/2020 (doc. #11 ). The plaintiff does not seek leave to amend her complaint as allowed by Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. She instead appears to seek reconsideration of the order denying her Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, received 2/7/2020 (doc. #7 ), as moot because she is not an attorney. Both pro hac vice attorneys and pro se parties are subject to the very same requirement to follow the rules of the Northern District of Texas. Pro hac vice status will not afford the plaintiff any greater rights in this case than she already has. Any motion for reconsideration is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/14/2020) (ctf)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend a Complaint filed by Charity Colleen Crouse with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s)) (Crouse, Charity)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying the pro se plaintiff's #9 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/13/2020) (mcrd) (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/13/2020) (mcrd).
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Motion for Leave to Amend a Complaint filed by Charity Colleen Crouse with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Crouse, Charity)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: the pro se plaintiff's #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Because the plaintiff may represent herself in this case, and she is not an attorney, her motion to appear pro hac vice is unnecessary, and it is DENIED AS MOOT. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/11/2020) (mcrd)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing filed by Charity Colleen Crouse. (axm)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #4 Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/21/2020) (mcrd)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charity Colleen Crouse. (hml)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charity Colleen Crouse. (hml)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Texas State Senate filed by Charity Colleen Crouse. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hml)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crouse v. Texas State Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas State Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Colleen Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?