Baker v. Bell Textron Inc et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Baker
Defendant: Safran Helicopter Engines USA Inc, Safran USA Inc and Bell Textron Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00292
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by Bell Textron Inc re #6 Response/Objection (David, Bryan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by Bell Textron Inc re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (David, Bryan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Timothy Baker with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Petition) (Aldous, Charla)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bell Textron, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (David, Bryan)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bell Textron, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Textron Inc. for Bell Textron, Inc.. (David, Bryan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from Court at Law No. 2, case number CC-20-00653-B filed by Bell Textron, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10599484) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s)) (David, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Bell Textron Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safran Helicopter Engines USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safran USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Textron Inc
Represented By: Bryan S David
Represented By: David Denny
Represented By: Charles H Smith
Represented By: J Michael Colpoys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Baker
Represented By: Brent R Walker
Represented By: Caleb Michael Miller
Represented By: Charla G Aldous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?