Anderson et al v. Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Dixie North, LeAnne Anderson and Jeff Quan
Defendant: Baylor Health Care System, Hunt Memorial Hospital Districtr Charitable Health Foundation, Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation and Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation doing business as Hunt Regional Healthcare Foundation doing business as Hunt Regional Medical Center at Greenville
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2020cv00304
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (ndt)
July 7, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas W. Hayde ("Applicant"). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/30/2020) (chmb)
April 7, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Dismissal Of Baylor Health Care System Without Prejudice filed by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ellzey, Jarrett)
March 23, 2020 Filing 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10720579) filed by Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Cerfiticate of Good Standing of Thomas W. Hayde)Attorney Thomas W Hayde added to party Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation(pty:dft) (Hayde, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Jeff Kaplan as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/2/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/20/2020) (epm)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay. The Court stays this lawsuit until 7/2/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/18/2020) (rekc)
March 17, 2020 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation (Tuma, Shawn)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants #18 Defendant Baylor Health Care System's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Baylor Health Care System shall answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint by April 16, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/16/2020) (chmb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Baylor Health Care System Attorney Sean Benjamin Solis added to party Baylor Health Care System(pty:dft) (Solis, Sean)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary M. Klinger ("Applicant"). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/9/2020) (chmb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation ; served on 2/28/2020. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Baylor Health Care System ; served on 2/25/2020. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION to Waive Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/26/2020) (ykp)
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Waive Local Rule 83.10(a) filed by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ellzey, Jarrett)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Gary M. Klinger (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10616658) filed by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ellzey, Jarrett)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Electronic Order: Unless exempted, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in or maintain their principal office in this district. To date, one or more of the parties has failed to comply with Local Rule 83.10 or file a motion for leave to appear without local counsel. The parties have twenty days from this date to comply if they have not already done so. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/12/2020) (chmb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Ed Kinkeade recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:20-cv-304-S. (chmb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:20-cv-304-K. (ctf)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Baylor Health Care System, Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation. (oyh)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 ****DISREGARD, SEE DOC #7 *** New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically.(oyh) Modified on 2/10/2020 (oyh).
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons as to Hunt Memorial by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan. (Ellzey, Jarrett) Modified text on 2/16/2020 (axm).
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons as to Baylor Health Care System by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan (Ellzey, Jarrett) Modified event text on 2/16/2020 (axm).
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT (Civil Cover Sheet) to #1 Complaint, by LeAnne Anderson, Dixie North, Jeff Quan. (Ellzey, Jarrett) Modified event text on 2/16/2020 (axm).
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by LeAnne Anderson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10604893) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ellzey, Jarrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie North
Represented By: Leigh S Montgomery
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Represented By: William Craft Hughes
Represented By: Jarrett L Ellzey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeAnne Anderson
Represented By: Jarrett L Ellzey, Jr
Represented By: Leigh S Montgomery
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Represented By: William Craft Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Quan
Represented By: Leigh S Montgomery
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Represented By: William Craft Hughes
Represented By: Jarrett L Ellzey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Health Care System
Represented By: Sean Benjamin Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Memorial Hospital Districtr Charitable Health Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation
Represented By: Thomas W Hayde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Memorial Hospital District Charitable Health Foundation doing business as Hunt Regional Healthcare Foundation doing business as Hunt Regional Medical Center at Greenville
Represented By: Thomas W Hayde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Jeff Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?