United States of America v. $1,433,196.55 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $1,433,196.55, $12,864.11 and $45,740.76
Claimant: John Grisham, John Berberian, James Courville, Rob Wilburn and Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00442
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #29 Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Edward Joseph Loya, Jr. shall be replaced as counsel of record for Claimant John Grisham, by attorneys Daniel K. Hagood and Alexandra Hunt. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/11/2020) (chmb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Daniel Kevin Hagood,Daniel Kevin Hagood,Alexandra Hunt for John Grisham. Motion filed by John Grisham Attorney Daniel Kevin Hagood added to party John Grisham(pty:clm) (Hagood, Daniel)
May 26, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per 28 Order. (mla)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Joint Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding. It is ORDERED that this case is STAYED for 180 days from the date this order is filed, i.e. up to and until November 22, 2020. Should the parties seek to continue the stay past the 180 days, the parties shall file a motion to that effect. This Court directs the clerk to administratively close this matter. ( #26 Motion to Stay, filed by John Berberian, James Courville, Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC, John Grisham, Rob Wilburn, United States of America terminated.) (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/26/2020) (chmb)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Decided at Docket No. 25. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/26/2020) (chmb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding filed by John Berberian, James Courville, John Grisham, Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC, United States of America, Rob Wilburn with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri) Modified Docket Text on 5/26/2020 (oyh).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #24 Claimant Trinity Clinical Laboratory, LLC's Joint Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or File Responsive Pleading. Claimants Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC, Rob Wilburn, James Courville, and John Grisham's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to fourteen (14) days after the forthcoming joint motion to stay is either denied or the resulting stay is lifted. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/16/2020) (chmb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 24 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Consent, #2 Proposed Order) (Werner, Paul)
April 8, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Berberian. (Steel, Brian)
April 8, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by John Berberian. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Steel, Brian)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jane H. Yoon. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/31/2020) (chmb)
March 31, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Publication filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10736558) filed by Rob Wilburn (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Jane H Yoon added to party Rob Wilburn(pty:clm) (Yoon, Jane)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Claim filed by Rob Wilburn (Yoon, Jane)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 Verified Claim by James Courville. (Howell, Barrett)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee Vartan. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/30/2020) (chmb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10735870) filed by James Courville (Attachments: #1 Certificate). Party James Courville added.Attorney Lee Vartan added to party James Courville(pty:clm) (Vartan, Lee)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 Verified Claim Pursuant to Rule G(5)(a)(i) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions Claim by John Grisham. (Loya, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Steel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/27/2020) (chmb)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul D. Werner. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/27/2020) (chmb)
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10729803) filed by John Berberian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Brian Steel added to party John Berberian(pty:clm) (Steel, Brian)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Claim by Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC. (Werner, Paul)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10728196) filed by Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC (Werner, Paul)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Donald Werner on behalf of Trinity Clinical Laboratories, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Werner, Paul)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Owner and Majority Member Claim by John Berberian. (Gillett, Brian)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 **DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR. SEE DOC. #7 ** Claim by $1,433,196.55, $12,864.11, $45,740.76. (Gillett, Brian) Modified on 3/24/2020 (chmb).
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest of Property in Rem filed by United States of America. (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Rocha-DOJ, Dimitri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $1,433,196.55 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,433,196.55
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $12,864.11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $45,740.76
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Dimitri Narciso Rocha-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John Grisham
Represented By: Edward Joseph Loya, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Kevin Hagood
Represented By: Alexandra Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John Berberian
Represented By: Brian Steel
Represented By: Brian Matthew Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Courville
Represented By: Lee Vartan
Represented By: Barrett R Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rob Wilburn
Represented By: Jane H Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Trinity Clinical Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Paul Donald Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?