Chamberlain v. Fred's Bluelight Investments Inc et al
Plaintiff: Amber Chamberlain
Defendant: Brooke Doe, Fred's Bluelight Investments Inc, Jade Doe, TX Triple LLC, James Vick, 8128 Camp Bowie LLC, Larry Wrangler, Curtis Wise and Jennifer Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv00776
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 8128 Camp Bowie LLC. (Wallace, Casey)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by 8128 Camp Bowie LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Casey T Wallace added to party 8128 Camp Bowie LLC(pty:dft) (Wallace, Casey)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to 8128 Camp Bowie LLC ; served on 4/8/2020. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Larry Wrangler. (mla)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Amber Chamberlain. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to 8128 Camp Bowie LLC, Fred's Bluelight Investments Inc, TX Triple LLC, James Vick, Curtis Wise. (hml)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to 8128 Camp Bowie filed by Amber Chamberlain. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Curtis Wise filed by Amber Chamberlain. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Fred's Bluelight filed by Amber Chamberlain. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to James Vick filed by Amber Chamberlain. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Amber Chamberlain. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Amber Chamberlain. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10744451) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Cover Sheet) (Ellzey, Jarrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlain v. Fred's Bluelight Investments Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred's Bluelight Investments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TX Triple LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8128 Camp Bowie LLC
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wrangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Chamberlain
Represented By: Jarrett L Ellzey, Jr
Represented By: William Craft Hughes
Represented By: Leigh S Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?