Arellano v. ADA Logistics Corp et al
Plaintiff: Alvaro Arellano
Defendant: ADA Logistics Corp, Nezira Gegic, Aleksandar Manic and Skyline Finance Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00795
Filed: April 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment against ADA Logistics Corp, Aleksandar Manic filed by Alvaro Arellano (Graham, Joshua)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Appendix in Support filed by Nezira Gegic, Skyline Finance Group LLC re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss (Minocha, Sanjay)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (), MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nezira Gegic, Skyline Finance Group LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Sanjay Kumar Minocha added to party Nezira Gegic(pty:dft), Attorney Sanjay Kumar Minocha added to party Skyline Finance Group LLC(pty:dft) (Minocha, Sanjay)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ADA Logistics Corp, Aleksandar Manic, Nezira Gegic, Skyline Finance Group LLC. (ykp)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alvaro Arellano. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Graham, Joshua)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY/WILL REFILE***AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alvaro Arellano. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Graham, Joshua) Modified on 4/22/2020 (ykp).
April 4, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
April 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alvaro Arellano. (Graham, Joshua)
April 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alvaro Arellano. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10747529) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Graham, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano v. ADA Logistics Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA Logistics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nezira Gegic
Represented By: Sanjay Kumar Minocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksandar Manic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Finance Group LLC
Represented By: Sanjay Kumar Minocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Arellano
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?