Jones v. Covington Credit of Texas Inc
Plaintiff: Yolanda Jones
Defendant: Covington Credit of Texas Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00798
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER - 1. Plaintiffs must file their Motion for Conditional Class Certification by November 2, 2020. The motion must otherwise comply with Local Rule 23.2 (except paragraph (f)), and must be accompanied by a supporting brief and all supporting evidence, including expert testimony, if any. Responses to the Motion for Conditional Class Certification are due no later than December 2, 2020. Replies is support of the Motion for Conditional Class Certification are due no later than December 16, 2020. 2. Discovery may begin immediately, but this discovery closes October 12, 2020. All written discovery must be sent in a timely manner such that any response is due before class certification discovery closes. 3. The parties shall mediate this case no later than December 15, 2020, and the parties shall file a Joint Report on mediation no later than 7 days after mediation occurs. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case. After ruling on the issue of conditional certification, the Court will reopen this case and issue a separate order requiring the parties to file a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order to address the deadlines for the remainder of this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/4/2020) (chmb)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Yolanda Jones, Covington Credit of Texas Inc. (Vaught, Allen) Modified title and filers on 6/4/2020 (nhp).
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covington Credit of Texas Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Southern Management Corporation for Covington Credit of Texas Inc. (Brown, John)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/13/2020) (chmb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Covington Credit of Texas Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brown, John) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (dsr).
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Covington Credit of Texas Inc answer or response due 5/14/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/28/2020) (chmb)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Covington Credit of Texas Inc Attorney John B Brown added to party Covington Credit of Texas Inc(pty:dft) (Brown, John)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Covington Credit of Texas Inc ; served on 4/10/2020. (Vaught, Allen)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Covington Credit of Texas Inc. (oyh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Yolanda Jones. (Vaught, Allen)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yolanda Jones. (Vaught, Allen)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Yolanda Jones. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10748498) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join by Yolanda Jones, #2 Cover Sheet) (Vaught, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Covington Credit of Texas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Credit of Texas Inc
Represented By: John B Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Jones
Represented By: Allen Ryan Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?