McNaughten v. AT&T Inc
Plaintiff: Brenda McNaughten
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00936
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Inc. (Hernandez, Stacey)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by AT&T Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Hernandez, Stacey)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by AT&T Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)Attorney Stacey Cho Hernandez added to party AT&T Inc(pty:dft) (Hernandez, Stacey)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AT&T Inc ; served on 4/24/2020. (Hunnicutt, James)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant AT&T Inc to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 5/29/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/14/2020) (chmb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AT&T Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Courtney Barksdale Perez added to party AT&T Inc(pty:dft) (Perez, Courtney)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brenda McNaughten. (Hunnicutt, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (oyh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Brenda McNaughten. (Spencer, Jennifer)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T, Inc. filed by Brenda McNaughten. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10772581) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Spencer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNaughten v. AT&T Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda McNaughten
Represented By: Dimple Abraham Baca
Represented By: Jennifer J Spencer
Represented By: James E Hunnicutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Represented By: Stacey Cho Hernandez
Represented By: Courtney Barksdale Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?