Porter v. City of Dallas et al
Plaintiff: Latoya K Porter
Defendant: Dallas Police Department and City of Dallas
Case Number: 3:2020cv00999
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand filed by Latoya K Porter (Attachments: #1 Motion to Remand pg. 2) (Bickel, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case via random assignment to Judge Jane J. Boyle for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:20-cv-999-B. (ctf)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Supplemental Document (Cover Sheet and Supplemental) by City of Dallas as to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Chuba, Lyudmyla) Modified Docket Text on 4/22/2020 (oyh).
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 14th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-17257 filed by City of Dallas. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10786343) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) C-1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) C-2 - Citation with Return of Service, Unexecuted (Chief Ulisha Renee Hall), #5 Exhibit(s) C-3 - Citation with Return of Service (City of Dallas), #6 Exhibit(s) C-4 - Citation with Return of Service (Dallas Police Department), #7 Exhibit(s) C-5 - Citation with Return of Service (Major Michael Igo), #8 Exhibit(s) C-6 - Defendants City of Dallas, Dallas Police Department, and Major Michael Igos Special Exceptions, Original Answer, and Verified Denial, #9 Exhibit(s) C-7 - Notice of Non-Jury Trial, #10 Exhibit(s) C-8 - Scheduling Order, #11 Exhibit(s) C-9 - Defendant City of Dallass Motion to Dismiss Chief Ulisha Renee Hall and Major Michael Igo, #12 Exhibit(s) C-10 - Defendant City of Dallass Supplemental Special Exceptions to Plaintiffs Original Petition, #13 Exhibit(s) C-11 - Order (proposed) Granting Defendant City of Dallass Motion to Dismiss Chief Ulisha Renee Hall and Major Michael Igo, #14 Exhibit(s) C-12 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Chief Ulisha Renee Hall and Major Michael Igo, #15 Exhibit(s) C-13 - Notice of Certificate of Conference, #16 Exhibit(s) C-14 - Notice of Hearing on Special Exceptions Contained in Defendants City of Dallas, Dallas Police Department, and Major Michael Igos Special Exceptions, Original Answer, and Verified Denial, #17 Exhibit(s) C-15 - Notice of Cancelation of Hearing on Special Exceptions Contained in Defendants City of Dallas, Dallas Police Department, and Major Michael Igos Special Exceptions, Original Answer, and Verified Denial, #18 Exhibit(s) C-16 - Notice of Amended Certificate of Conference, #19 Exhibit(s) C-17 - Notice of Hearing on Defendants Supplemental Special Exceptions to Plaintiffs Original Petition and Motion to Dismiss Chief Ulisha Renee Hall and Major Michael Igo, #20 Exhibit(s) C-18 - Citation with Return of Service (Chief Ulisha Renee Hall), #21 Exhibit(s) C-19 - Defendant Chief of Police Ulisha Renee Halls Original Answer, #22 Exhibit(s) C-20 - Order Granting Defendant City of Dallass Motion to Dismiss Chief Ulisha Renee Hall and Major Michael Igo, #23 Exhibit(s) C-21 - Letter enclosing Order (proposed) on Defendant City of Dallass Supplemental Special Exceptions to Plaintiffs Original Petition, #24 Exhibit(s) C-22 - Order on Defendant City of Dallass Supplemental Special Exceptions to Plaintiffs Original Petition, #25 Exhibit(s) C-23 - Notice of Certificate of Conference, #26 Exhibit(s) C-24 - Plaintiffs First Amended Original Petition, #27 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons, #28 Exhibit(s) E - City of Dallas's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff LaToya K. Porter, #29 Exhibit(s) F-1 - Plaintiff's Answer to Interrogatories, p.1, #30 Exhibit(s) F-2 - Plaintiff's Answer to Interrogatories, p.2, #31 Exhibit(s) G - Electronic Service Notification) (Chuba, Lyudmyla)
April 22, 2020 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Dallas. ( See Document #1 for Image) (oyh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. City of Dallas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Police Department
Represented By: Lyudmyla Chuba
Represented By: Jennifer Carter Huggard
Represented By: Jennifer A Brissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas
Represented By: Lyudmyla Chuba
Represented By: Jennifer Carter Huggard
Represented By: Jennifer A Brissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya K Porter
Represented By: John W Bickel, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?