Kirven-Hill v. Court of Appeals Fifth District of Texas at Dallas et al
Petitioner: Rosick D Kirven-Hill
Respondent: Court of Appeals Fifth District of Texas at Dallas, NFN Deyne, NFN Norsworthy and Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2020cv01042
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Louise Wissinger on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wissinger, Jennifer)
May 7, 2020 Acknowledgment of Electronic Service from the Office of Attorney General of Texas re #6 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ykp)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Electronic service made to the Office of Attorney General of Texas re #6 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (axm)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. Deadline to reply to the answer is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/6/2020) (axm)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/6/2020) (axm)
May 6, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Wed May 6 12:44:55 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 27, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Apr 27 14:10:59 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Rosick D Kirven-Hill. (mjr)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rosick D Kirven-Hill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirven-Hill v. Court of Appeals Fifth District of Texas at Dallas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosick D Kirven-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Court of Appeals Fifth District of Texas at Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NFN Deyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NFN Norsworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?