Kuster v. Western Digital Corporation
Plaintiff: Martin Kuster
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv01089
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 19 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mla)
June 24, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #18 Notice of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (mla)
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Martin Kuster (Ramey, Cole)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 , #16 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of L. Kieran Kieckhefer, Matthew G. Berkowitz. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2020) (chmb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney L. Kieran Kieckhefer (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10893579) filed by Western Digital Corporation (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney L Kieran Kieckhefer added to party Western Digital Corporation(pty:dft) (Kieckhefer, L)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Matthew G. Berkowitz (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10893551) filed by Western Digital Corporation (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew G Berkowitz added to party Western Digital Corporation(pty:dft) (Berkowitz, Matthew)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 and #9 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Russell A. Korn and David A. Reed. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/26/2020) (chmb)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 6/25/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/20/2020) (mla)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Western Digital Corporation. (Whittlesey, David)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Complaint, filed by Western Digital Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whittlesey, David)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David P Whittlesey on behalf of Western Digital Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Whittlesey, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10847179) filed by Martin Kuster (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney David A Reed added to party Martin Kuster(pty:pla) (Reed, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10847150) filed by Martin Kuster (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Russell A Korn added to party Martin Kuster(pty:pla) (Korn, Russell)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Western Digital Corporation; served on 5/5/2020. (Ramey, Cole)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Western Digital Corporation. (hml)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (hml)
May 1, 2020 Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn reassigned as presiding judge per Special Order 3-287. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to the case. (ctf)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Martin Kuster. (Ramey, Cole)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Martin Kuster. (Ramey, Cole)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Western Digital Corporation filed by Martin Kuster. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10806475) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet) (Ramey, Cole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuster v. Western Digital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation
Represented By: Matthew G Berkowitz
Represented By: David P Whittlesey
Represented By: L Kieran Kieckhefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Kuster
Represented By: Cole B Ramey
Represented By: David A Reed
Represented By: Russell A Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?