Cerda et al v. III Office Resource Group Inc et al
Petitioner: William Alexander Lopez Sanchez, Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez and Sergio Cerda
Respondent: III Office Resource Group Inc and Paul Ross Lowe, III
Case Number: 3:2020cv01313
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Jennifer Calhoun as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/24/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/18/2020) (ndt)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 6/21/2021 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 7/17/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2020. Motions due by 3/8/2021. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Settlement Status Report due by 8/7/2020. Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 5/31/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2021 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/18/2020) (axm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT of Parties filed by Paul Ross Lowe, III. (Clark, Steven)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/29/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/8/2020) (ndt)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Paul Ross Lowe, III. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Clark, Steven)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00249. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
May 19, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the NORTHERN District of TEXAS DALLAS Division. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - GRANTING #6 Motion to Transfer Venue. It is therefore ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this matter to the District Clerk for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division, where the case shall be assigned for further disposition. As there is no opposition to the transfer of this case, the Clerk is instructed to transfer the case without delay. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/19/2020. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sergio Cerda, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William Alexander Lopez Sanchez, Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #11 Order, of Non-Opposition (Forester, Jesse) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt. #6 ), to which no response has been filed. Plaintiffs shall file a response no later than May 26, 2020, or notify the Court that there is no opposition. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/15/2020. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Sergio Cerda, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William Alexander Lopez Sanchez, Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc Regarding Service - Defendant III Office Resource Group, Inc. Served on 4/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Forester, Jesse) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 29, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - COMPLETED TWO PAGE SUMMONS WAS NOT FILED. Document # 9, SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Cerda. III Office Resource Group, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Forester, Jesse) Modified on 4/29/2020 (baf, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc, Sergio Cerda, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William Alexander Lopez Sanchez. Paul Ross Lowe, III served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Forester, Jesse) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Certificate of Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Venue by III Office Resource Group, Inc., Paul Ross Lowe, III. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 17, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE submitted DOCUMENT #5 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULE CV-7(a). Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by III Office Resource Group, Inc., Paul Ross Lowe, III. Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support M to Transfer Venue, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Steven) Modified on 4/17/2020 (baf, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Paul Ross Lowe, III. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to III Office Resource Group, Inc.. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
March 25, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Sergio Cerda, Eddi E Lam Yoc, Marvin L Lopez Gramajo, William A Lopez Sanchez, Edelman Sanchez of Filing Certificate of Interested Parties (Forester, Jesse) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against III Office Resource Group, Inc., Paul R Lowe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7725425.), filed by Eddi E Lam Yoc, Sergio Cerda, Marvin L Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William A Lopez Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forester, Jesse) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerda et al v. III Office Resource Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Alexander Lopez Sanchez
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edelman Sanchez
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sergio Cerda
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: III Office Resource Group Inc
Represented By: Steven E Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Ross Lowe, III
Represented By: Steven E Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?