Mata et al v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Hughes, Tina Votava, Terrance Thompson, Stanley Smith, Ricardo Mata, Norman Gueno, Ronald Dominy, Darell Harvey, Malilae Washington and Kathleen Higgs
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc and C R Bard Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01531
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This civil action is transferred to the docket of Judge Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-CV-1531-S. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/7/2020) (aaa)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs have until 8/3/2020 to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. It is further ORDERED that Defendants have until 9/3/2020 to file replies. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/29/2020) (ykp)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 11 replaced to flatten image on 6/18/2020) (dsr).
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10907739) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #15 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mata et al v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Hughes
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Votava
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Thompson
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Smith
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Mata
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Gueno
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dominy
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darell Harvey
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malilae Washington
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Higgs
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?