Martinez v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Roberto Martinez
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2020cv01630
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Tue Jul 14 12:10:29 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court TRANSFERS Petitioner's unauthorized successive 28 U.S.C. 2254 habeas application to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit for appropriate action. (Fifth Circuit notified via copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/14/2020) (twd)
June 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Jun 22 12:23:37 CDT 2020 (crt) Modified on 7/9/2020 - Printer Error, document mailed on 7/9/2020 (axm).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should transfer the successive habeas application to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit for appropriate action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/22/2020) (twd)
June 19, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6, 7. Fri Jun 19 11:09:42 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (oyh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:20-cv-00695. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Roberto Martinez. (nm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roberto Martinez. (nm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Roberto Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(nm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (nm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (nm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roberto Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward L Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?