AJ Homecare Connection Inc v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: AJ Homecare Connection Inc. and AJ Homecare Connection Inc
Defendant: Palmetto GBA, LLC, Seema Verma, Alex M Azar, II and Palmetto GBA LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01639
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by AJ Homecare Connection Inc. Request for Expedited Hearing and Ruling On Emergency Motion and Application for TRO. (Lindsay, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY filed by AJ Homecare Connection Inc re: #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #9 Response/Objection (Lindsay, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #2 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff AJ Homecare Connection Inc. (Lindsay, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY filed by AJ Homecare Connection Inc re: #9 Response/Objection (Lindsay, David)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff AJ Homecare Connection Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion and Application. [ECF No. #13 ]. The Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion and Application is 8/20/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/10/2020) (ctf)
August 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 Response/Objection filed by AJ Homecare Connection Inc (Lindsay, David)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Lindsay. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/28/2020) (chmb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Mailing to Alex M. Azar by AJ Homecare Connection Inc. (Lindsay, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11011484) filed by AJ Homecare Connection Inc (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney David C Lindsay added to party AJ Homecare Connection Inc(pty:pla) (Lindsay, David)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Alex M Azar, II, Palmetto GBA LLC, Seema Verma re: #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ on behalf of Alex M Azar, II, Palmetto GBA LLC, Seema Verma. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Palmetto Service, #2 Declaration(s) Verma Service) (Bower, Adrian)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Palmetto GBA LLC, Seema Verma, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by AJ Homecare Connection Inc. (Bower, Adrian)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AJ Homecare Connection Inc.. (Bower, Adrian)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by AJ Homecare Connection Inc. (Bower, Adrian)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by AJ Homecare Connection Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10931909.) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C2C Corrected Report, #2 Exhibit(s) March 4 Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Suja John, #4 Exhibit(s) Request for ALJ) (Bower, Adrian) Modified Payment information on 6/22/2020 (hml).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AJ Homecare Connection Inc v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto GBA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto GBA LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Homecare Connection Inc.
Represented By: Adrian Edward Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Homecare Connection Inc
Represented By: Adrian Edward Bower
Represented By: David C Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?