Moreno v. Home Depot USA Inc
Plaintiff: Kimberly Moreno
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc formerly known as Home Depot Inc doing business as Home Depot #589 and Home Depot Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01894
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Kimberly Moreno (Lamb, A)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Farrar, Chad)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Trial set for four-week docket beginning 11/1/2021 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 11/9/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2020. Motions due by 6/1/2021. Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 10/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/29/2020) (jmg)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Farrar, Chad)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/10/2020) (axm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Moreno. (Lamb, A)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The plaintiff has yet to provide the clerk with a certificate of interested persons. N.D. TEX. CIV. R. 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) requires that "[w]hen a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with... a separately signed certificate of interested persons that contains a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities who or which are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/20/2020) (chmb)
July 20, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Mon Jul 20 09:11:50 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Home Depot Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Farrar, Chad)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11004813) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) B, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Farrar, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc formerly known as Home Depot Inc doing business as Home Depot #589
Represented By: Flannery Hoard Nardone
Represented By: Chad L Farrar
Represented By: C Brett Stecklein
Represented By: Katherine Phillips Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Inc
Represented By: Flannery Hoard Nardone
Represented By: Chad L Farrar
Represented By: C Brett Stecklein
Represented By: Katherine Phillips Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Moreno
Represented By: Layla Ann Benjamin
Represented By: Daniel L Morris
Represented By: A Robert Lamb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?