1914 Commerce Leasing LLC v. Great American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 1914 Commerce Leasing LLC
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01896
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Having considered Defendant's Amended Notice of Removal, the Court finds that Defendant has adequately addressed the Court's concern and established the existence of diversity jurisdiction in this civil action. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a response to Defendant's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss by no later than 9/28/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/14/2020) (ctf)
September 7, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Great American Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Pipkin, Mike)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court, having considered Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendant's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss, filed 8/6/2020, is of the opinion that the same should be GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff's deadline in which to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is EXTENDED by 14 days after the date in which the Court determines whether complete diversity of citizenship exists. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/10/2020) (ctf)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 1914 Commerce Leasing LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Love, Robert)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc. for Great American Insurance Company. (Pipkin, Mike)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant is hereby permitted to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery in order to determine the citizenship of PNC Investment Company, LLC. Defendant's deadline in which to file a response to the Court's Show Cause Order is EXTENDED to 9/7/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/3/2020) (ykp)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2020. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Discovery due by 12/13/2021. Trial set for 1/4/2022 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/3/2020) (axm)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 1914 Commerce Leasing LLC. (Love, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #6 Motion for Leave to File by Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Pipkin, Mike)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery and for Extension of Time to Show Cause filed by Great American Insurance Company (Pipkin, Mike)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this civil action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction by providing the Court with information regarding the members of PNC Investment Company, LLC and the citizenship of those members. Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/20/2020) (oyh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Pipkin, Mike)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Pipkin, Mike)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11005134) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Record, #2 Cover Sheet) (Pipkin, Mike)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1914 Commerce Leasing LLC v. Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1914 Commerce Leasing LLC
Represented By: Benjamin L Riemer
Represented By: Robert Kent Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jadyn Christina Cleveland
Represented By: Mike F Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?