Blakely v. Dallas County Jail
Plaintiff: Cameron Blakely
Defendant: Dallas County Jail
Case Number: 3:2020cv01911
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Aug 12 11:37:30 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT AND FILING FEE: Cameron Blakely must address the following deficiency: The plaintiffs did not file their complaint on the proper form for a civil rights action under 42 U.S.C. 1983. A filing fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 9/11/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/12/2020) (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form, #2 IFP Form) (axm)
July 21, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Jul 21 17:08:56 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Dallas County Jail filed by Cameron Blakely. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hml)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakely v. Dallas County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?