Giles v. Southwest Airlines Co
Plaintiff: Thomas Giles
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co
Case Number: 3:2020cv01919
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (mjr)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Aten Lamberson for Michael E. Coles on behalf of Thomas Giles. (Lamberson, Elizabeth)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02195. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 21, 2020 Case transferred to the Northern District of Texas. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Herrera, Isaiah) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE re #11 Stipulation to transfer venue filed by Thomas Giles. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/25/2020. (Ryan, Mary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION to transfer venue by Thomas Giles (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to June 23, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/11/2020. (Ameri, Mana) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Mueller, Jason) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Mueller on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co. (notification declined or already on case) (Mueller, Jason) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is directed to register for ECF within two (2) weeks. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, counsel shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that electronic notifications of activity in this case are received. Also, counsel shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/8/2020. (Ameri, Mana) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason Mueller Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12872716. by Southwest Airlines Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court Letter of Good Standing) (Mueller, Jason) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W. Garrity on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co. (aty to be noticed) (Garrity, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Giles. Southwest Airlines Co. served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Southwest Airlines Co.. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southwest Airlines Co. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12797713 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Thomas Giles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. Southwest Airlines Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co
Represented By: Jason E Mueller
Represented By: Paul W Garrity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Giles
Represented By: Elizabeth Aten Lamberson
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?